EP0768874 - Pharmaceutical compositions containing Triclosan or derivates thereof and EDTA or EGTA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/17] | Pharmaceutical compositions containing Triclosan or derivates thereof and Edta or Egta | ||
[1999/49] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.07.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 29.08.2001 [2001/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RECKITT & COLMAN PRODUCTS LIMITED One Burlington Lane London W4 2RW / GB | [1997/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DETTMAR, Peter, William Tithe House Tithe Barn Lane Patrington North Humberside HU12 0PE / GB | 02 /
SMITH, Andrew, William 33 Burnhill Road Beckenham Kent BR3 3LA / GB | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | Dickson, Elizabeth Anne Reckitt Benckiser plc Group Patents Department, Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Dickson, Elizabeth Anne Reckitt Benckiser plc, Group Patents Department, Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | ||
Former [1997/17] | Allard, Susan Joyce BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95923465.9 | 29.06.1995 | [1997/17] | WO1995GB01544 | Priority number, date | GB19940013072 | 29.06.1994 Original published format: GB 9413072 | WO1995GB00540 | 13.03.1995 Original published format: PCT/GB95/00540 | GB19950005032 | 13.03.1995 Original published format: GB 9505032 | [1997/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9600569 | Date: | 11.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0768874 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/195, A61K31/66, // (A61K31/66, 31:195),(A61K31/195, 31:09) | [1997/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/195 (EP);
A61K31/66 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/195, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/195, A61K31/09 (EP);
A61K31/66, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/66, A61K31/195 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/17] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN WELCHE TRICLOSAN ODER DERIVATE DAVON UND EDTA ODER EGTA ENTHALTEN | [1999/47] | English: | Pharmaceutical compositions containing Triclosan or derivates thereof and EDTA or EGTA | [1999/49] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques renfermant du Triclosan ou ses derives et de l'EDTA ou de l'EGTA | [1999/49] |
Former [1997/17] | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen welche Triclosan oder Derivate und EDTA oder EGTA enthalten. | ||
Former [1997/17] | Pharmaceutical compositions containing Triclosan or derivates thereof and Edta or Egta | ||
Former [1997/17] | Compositions pharmaceutiques renfermant du Triclosan ou ses derives et de l'Edta ou de l'Egta | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 08.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/35] | 09.04.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2202698 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-21 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0455475 (RECKITT & COLMANN PROD LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * |