EP0744271 - Filtermedium for resin extruders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/48] | FILTER MEDIUM FOR RESIN EXTRUDERS AND SCREEN EXCHANGER FOR RESIN EXTRUDERS | ||
[2000/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 3-18, Wakinohamacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 3-18, Wakinohamacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHII, Yasuo Takasago Works, Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe seiko sho 3-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago-shi Hyogo 676 / JP | 02 /
NAGAMI, Nobuki Takasago Works, Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe seiko sho 3-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago-shi Hyogo 676 / JP | 03 /
YAMASAKI, Nobuhiro Takasago Works, Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe seiko sho 3-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago-shi Hyogo 676 / JP | 04 /
NAKATA, Yoshiaki Takasago Works, Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe seiko sho 3-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago-shi Hyogo 676 / JP | 05 /
FUKUMIZU, Shinichi Takasago Works Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe seiko sho 3-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago-shi Hyogo 676 / JP | 06 /
IKEDA, Osamu Takasago Works, Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe seiko sho 3-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago-shi Hyogo 676 / JP | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95923531.8 | 28.06.1995 | [1996/48] | WO1995JP01283 | Priority number, date | JP19940151243 | 01.07.1994 Original published format: JP 15124394 | JP19940152496 | 04.07.1994 Original published format: JP 15249694 | [1996/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9601178 | Date: | 18.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744271 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744271 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/68 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
B29C48/694 (EP,US);
B29C48/6912 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US);
B29C48/693 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1996/48] | Title | German: | Filter für Harzextruder | [2000/45] | English: | Filtermedium for resin extruders | [2000/45] | French: | Couche filtrante pour extrudeuses à résine | [2000/45] |
Former [1996/48] | FILTER UND FILTERWECHSLER FÜR HARZEXTRUDER | ||
Former [1996/48] | FILTER MEDIUM FOR RESIN EXTRUDERS AND SCREEN EXCHANGER FOR RESIN EXTRUDERS | ||
Former [1996/48] | COUCHE FILTRANTE POUR EXTRUDEUSES A RESINES ET DISPOSITIF DE REMPLACEMENT D'ECRANS POUR EXTRUDEUSES A RESINES | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.1996 | Translation filed | 22.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.1996 | Search fee paid | 15.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 02.04.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01112411.2 / EP1125713 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.04.1996 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1996 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2661497 (BIRMINGHAM JOHN N) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [A] 6,7; | [A]US3863001 (THUMUDO JR MARIO F) [A] 5* figures 1-6 *; | [X]GB2073038 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) [X] 6 * figure - *; | [XA]GB2096912 (DOLCI LANFRANCO) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figure - * * page 1, line 48 - line 65 * * page 1, line 106 - line 129 * [A] 3,4,8,9; | [X] - KOCHING H, "FOLIEN/FASERN - VERDICHTEN SCHMELZE - FILTRIERUNG", KUNSTSTOFFBERATER, (19920501), vol. 37, no. 5, pages 42 - 45, XP000293718 [X] 1-4 * figures 3,5,6 * | International search | [Y]JPS5577546 (NAKAMURA KENSAKU); | [A]JPS5765816U ; | [Y]JPS5927698B ; | [Y]JPS6448221U ; | [Y]JPH04300310 (NHK SPRING CO LTD); | [X]JPH04137826U |