EP0765516 - AUTOMATED ACCOMPANIMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/14] | AUTOMATED ACCOMPANIMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
[1998/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CODA MUSIC TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 6210 Bury Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55346-1718 / US | [1997/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAULSON, John, W. 6624 Cornelia Drive Edina, MN 55435 / US | 02 /
DUNN, Mark, E. 13945 Drummond Trail Apple Valley, MN 55124 / US | 03 /
HEIDORN, Allen, J. 16200 Pine Street Minnetonka, MN 55345 / US | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Orr, William McLean, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Orr, William McLean, et al URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire, LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [1997/14] | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95923893.2 | 14.06.1995 | [1997/14] | WO1995US07609 | Priority number, date | US19940261161 | 17.06.1994 Original published format: US 261161 | US19950383965 | 06.02.1995 Original published format: US 383965 | [1997/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9535562 | Date: | 28.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0765516 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0765516 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
G10H1/361 (EP,US);
G10H2210/281 (EP,US);
G10H2210/295 (EP,US);
G10H2220/101 (EP,US);
G10H2240/056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN BEGLEITUNG | [1998/49] | English: | AUTOMATED ACCOMPANIMENT METHOD | [1998/49] | French: | PROCEDE D'ACCOMPAGNEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | [1998/49] |
Former [1997/14] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN BEGLEITUNG | ||
Former [1997/14] | AUTOMATED ACCOMPANIMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
Former [1997/14] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ACCOMPAGNEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 19.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 03.03.1999 | [2015/36] |
Former [1999/30] | DE | 03.03.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4694724 (KIKUMOTO TADAO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,18 * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 28 ** column 16, line 42 - column 19, line 48; figures 3,4 *; | [AD]US4745836 (DANNENBERG ROGER B [US]) [AD] 3,15,16,18 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 49 * * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 45 * * column 6, line 29 - column 9, line 37; figures 1-5B *; | [A]EP0477869 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [A] 3,18-22 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0566232 (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 56; figure 1A * |