EP0766737 - POLYPEPTIDES WITH INTERLEUKIN 8 RECEPTOR 1 (IL8R1) BINDING DOMAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.04.1999 [1999/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville CA 94608-2916 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/15] | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEKAMP-OLSON, Patricia 80 Camino de Herrera San Anselmo, CA 94526 / US | 02 /
VENKATAKRISHNA, Shyamala 11430 Sun Valley Oakland, CA 94605 / US | 03 /
WERNETTE-HAMMOND, Mary Ellen 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 95608 / US | [1997/15] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/15] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95924033.4 | 20.06.1995 | [1997/15] | WO1995US07895 | Priority number, date | US19940262990 | 20.06.1994 Original published format: US 262990 | [1997/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9535376 | Date: | 28.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/55] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0766737 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/19, C07K14/52, C07K14/54, C12N15/24, C07K19/00, C12N15/62, C12N5/10 | [1997/15] | CPC: |
C07K14/5421 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/15] | Title | German: | POLYPEPTIDE MIT INTERLEUKIN-8 REZEPTOR 1 (IL8R1) BINDUNGSDOMÄNEN | [1997/15] | English: | POLYPEPTIDES WITH INTERLEUKIN 8 RECEPTOR 1 (IL8R1) BINDING DOMAINS | [1997/15] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES A DOMAINES DE LIAISON DU RECEPTEUR 1 DE L'INTERLEUKINE 8 (IL8R1) | [1997/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 17.02.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9311159 (THE BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH CENTRE LIMITED) [X] 1,2,12,22-24 * abstract * * example 4 *; | [X]US5079228 (A.B. COHEN ET AL) [X] 1,22-24 * claim -; table 2 * | [X] - P. LOETSCHER ET AL, "Both Interleukin-8 receptors independently mediate chemotaxis. Jurkat cells transfected with IL-8R1 or IL-8R2 migrate in response to IL-8, GROalpha and NAP-2", FEBS LETTERS, AMSTERDAM NL, vol. 341, no. 2-3, pages 187 - 192 [X] 1,2,5,16-18,23 * page 187, column R, line 1 - line 5 * * page 191, column R, line 7 - line 10 * * page 189, paragraph 3.1 * | [X] - I.U. SCHRAUFSTÄTTER ET AL, "Multiple sites on IL-8 responsible for binding to alpha and beta receptors", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, BALTIMORE US, (19931201), vol. 151, no. 11, pages 6418 - 6428 [X] 1-3,12,23 * page 6423 * | [X] - C.A. HEBERT ET AL, "Scanning mutagenesis of Interleukin-8 identifies a cluster of residues required for receptor binding", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (19911005), vol. 266, no. 28, pages 18989 - 18994 [X] 1,12,20 * see the whole document especially; page 18993; table 1 * | [X] - I. CLARK-LEWIS ET AL, "Structural requirements for Interleukin-8 function identified by design of analogs and CXC chemokine hybrids", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (19940610), vol. 269, no. 23, pages 16075 - 16081 [X] 12,20 * page 16078, column L * * table 1 * |