EP0835051 - A SOIL PENETRATING TOOL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yeomans, Allan James 60 Sunrise Boulevard Surfers Paradise, QLD 4217 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states YEOMANS, Allan James 60 Sunrise Boulevard Surfers Paradise, QLD 4217 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Gee, Steven William D.W. & S.W. GEE 1 South Lynn Gardens London Road Shipston on Stour, Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Gee, Steven William Farmhouse Court, Marston Sutton Coldfield, West Midlands B76 0DW / GB | Application number, filing date | 95924096.1 | 30.06.1995 | [1998/16] | WO1995AU00396 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9701949 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835051 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835051 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01B61/04 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
A01B61/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/16] | Title | German: | IN DEN BODEN EINDRINGENDE GERÄTEVERBINDUNG | [1998/16] | English: | A SOIL PENETRATING TOOL ASSEMBLY | [1998/16] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE CONSTITUANT UN OUTIL POUR LABOURER LA TERRE | [1998/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 28.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 28.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 26.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 21.06.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/30] | DE | 21.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0109882 (HUARD UCF [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11 * abstract * [A] 3-9,12-15 | International search | [X]SU387642 ; | [A]SU498923 ; | [X]DE1908381 (RABEWERK CLAUSING HEINRICH); | [X]US4353421 (LAHTI LASSE); | [Y]AU7944991 (JOHN WILLIAM RYAN); | [X]GB2259839 (KVERNELAND KLEPP AS [NO]) | [X] - DERWENT SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, SECTION III, MECHANICAL AND GENERAL, Volume V, No. 16, issued 24 May 1974, Miscellaneous, page 3; & SU,A,387 642 (ALEKSANDRYAN et al.) 9 October 1973., & SU387642 A 00000000 | [A] - DERWENT ABSTRACT, Accession No. K6412X/44, Class P11; & SU,A,498 923 (VORON FOREST INST) 14 April 1976., & SU498923 A 00000000 |