EP0767728 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF FOAM USING CARBON DIOXIDE DISSOLVED UNDER PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | For all designated states Hennecke GmbH 51379 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/14] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK HENNECKE GmbH D-51379 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIBEN, Robert Wolfskaul 12 D-51061 Köln / DE | 02 /
EBELING, Wilfried Odenthaler Strasse 52 D-51069 Köln / DE | 03 /
SULZBACH, Hans-Michael Hermann-Löns-Strasse 12 D-53639 Königswinter / DE | 04 /
RAFFEL, Reiner Müschbungert 2 D-53721 Siegburg / DE | [1997/16] | Application number, filing date | 95924245.4 | 16.06.1995 | [1997/16] | WO1995EP02322 | Priority number, date | DE19944422568 | 28.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4422568 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9600644 | Date: | 11.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0767728 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0767728 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0767728 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/46 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
B29C44/3473 (EP,US);
B29C44/348 (EP,US);
B29C44/461 (EP,US);
Y10S261/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHAUMHERSTELLUNG MITTELS UNTER DRUCK GELÖSTEM KOHLENDIOXID | [1997/16] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF FOAM USING CARBON DIOXIDE DISSOLVED UNDER PRESSURE | [1997/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE MOUSSE A L'AIDE DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE DISSOUS SOUS PRESSION | [1997/16] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 11.04.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 18.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.1999
06.05.2002
WITHDRAWN Foaming Technologies CarDio B.V. Hoekenrode 6-8 1102 BR, Amsterdam The Netherlands / NL Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | 02
18.02.1999
27.12.2000
WITHDRAWN Beamech Group Limited Tenax Road Trafford Park Manchester M17 1JT / GB Opponent's representative WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.1999
06.05.2002
WITHDRAWN Foaming Technologies CarDio B.V. Hoekenrode 6-8 1102 BR, Amsterdam The Netherlands / NL Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, Dr. Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
18.02.1999
27.12.2000
WITHDRAWN Beamech Group Limited Tenax Road Trafford Park Manchester M17 1JT / GB Opponent's representative W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | |||
Former [2002/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.1999
06.05.2002
WITHDRAWN Foaming Technologies CarDio B.V. Hoekenrode 6-8 1102 BR, Amsterdam The Netherlands / NL Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, Dr. Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
18.02.1999
27.12.2000
WITHDRAWN Beamech Group Limited Tenax Road Trafford Park Manchester M17 1JT / GB Opponent's representative W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | |||
Former [1999/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.1999
WITHDRAWN Foaming Technologies CarDio B.V. Hoekenrode 6-8 1102 BR, Amsterdam The Netherlands / NL Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
18.02.1999
Beamech Group Limited Tenax Road Trafford Park Manchester M17 1JT / GB Opponent's representative W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | 25.03.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.09.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.10.1999 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2000 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 09.05.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.11.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.01.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 04.07.2001 | Appeal received No. T0764/01 | 25.10.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.08.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9216363 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0378243 (SEALED AIR CORP [US]) [A] 1; | [A]WO9404256 (MARATHON OIL CO [US]) [A] 1; | [A]US3833202 (CRYSTAL M) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0587078 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph L *; | [DA]US4337318 (DOYLE EARL N) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPS53124575 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 49, Database accession no. 78-88510A, & JPS53124575 A 19781031 (HITACHI CHEMICAL KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | Opposition | US3108976 | US3184419 | EP0645226 |