EP0717985 - DERMATOLOGIC PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | ||
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 7-5-5, Ginza Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-10 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Norihisa Shiseido Research Center (1) 1050, Nippa-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP | 02 /
KAKU, Rumiko Shiseido Research Center (1) 1050, Nippa-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP | 03 /
YOKOKAWA, Yoshihiro Shiseido Research Center (1) 1050, Nippa-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP | 04 /
FUKUDA, Minoru Shiseido Research Center (1) 1050, Nippa-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1996/26] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95924521.8 | 07.07.1995 | [1996/26] | WO1995JP01360 | Priority number, date | JP19940179544 | 07.07.1994 Original published format: JP 17954494 | JP19950058149 | 21.02.1995 Original published format: JP 5814995 | [1996/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9601618 | Date: | 25.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0717985 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0717985 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/00, C07J53/00, A61K31/704 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
C07J63/008 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/45] | A61K7/48, A61K31/705, C07J53/00 | ||
Former IPC [1996/26] | A61K7/48, A61K7/00, A61K31/705, C07J53/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/26] | Title | German: | DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN | [1996/26] | English: | DERMATOLOGIC PREPARATION | [1996/26] | French: | PREPARATION DERMATOLOGIQUE | [1996/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.1996 | Translation filed | 15.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.1996 | Search fee paid | 15.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH0761998 (ITOEN KK); | [A]JPS638314 (SANSHO SEIYAKU KK); | [A]JPH04169515 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [A]JPH03279317 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) |