EP0814973 - VEHICLE MIRROR ADJUSTMENT GEAR TRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lear Automotive Dearborn, Inc. 5200 Auto Club Drive Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | [1999/37] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states UT Automotive Dearborn, Inc. 5200 Auto Club Drive Dearborn, MI 48126-9982 / US | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, INC. 1641 Porter Street Detroit, MI 48216 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERRY, William, M. 300 N. Main Palestine, OH 45352 / US | 02 /
HELMER, Kerry, L. 3995 Hollandsburg Road Hollandsburg, OH 45332 / US | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Gilding, Martin John, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Gilding, Martin John, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95924742.0 | 28.06.1995 | [1998/02] | WO1995US08170 | Priority number, date | US19950415042 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: US 415042 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9630230 | Date: | 03.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0814973 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0814973 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/06 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B60R1/072 (EP,US);
B60R1/02 (KR);
Y10T74/18808 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1967 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/02] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSPIEGELVERSTELLGETRIEBE | [1998/02] | English: | VEHICLE MIRROR ADJUSTMENT GEAR TRAIN | [1998/02] | French: | TRAIN D'ENGRENAGES POUR REGLER LE RETROVISEUR D'UN VEHICULE | [1998/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 06.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3914334 (KIENZLE UHRENFABRIKEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0278310 (COM MER ITALIA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * column A *; | [X]GB1576480 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1,2,7-9 * page 5, lines 9-112 *; | [A]GB2157387 (IKU HOLDING MONTFOORT BV); | [A]EP0538802 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0596182 (COMMER SPA [IT]); | [A]DE2456456 (MAERKLIN & CIE GMBH GEB); | [A]US4504116 (SHARP BERNARD C [US]) |