04.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
02.02.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
29.12.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] |
14.07.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] |
28.04.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] |
30.07.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] |
13.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.07.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
06.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.07.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
29.04.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
18.12.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.12.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.06.1998 |
First examination report |
|
18.06.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
13.03.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] |
13.03.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] |
06.02.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] |
04.02.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.02.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
29.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.1997 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] |
31.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.1997 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|