Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9600266 | Global Dossier | 04.01.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9410012 | 12.08.1994 | RU94021263 | 23.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2922795 | Global Dossier | 19.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9410012 | 12.08.1994 | RU94021263 | 23.06.1994 | EP9502416 | 22.06.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0837920 | Global Dossier | 15.09.1999 | B1 | EP0837920 | 29.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9502416 | 22.06.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69512280T | 11.05.2000 | T2 | DE69512280D1 | 21.10.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9502416 | 22.06.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2721690 | 20.08.1999 | B1 | FR2721690 | 29.12.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | RU94021263 | 23.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2089787 | 10.09.1997 | C1 | Priority number | Date | RU94021263 | 23.06.1994 |