Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2926595 | Global Dossier | 09.02.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9502574 | 30.06.1995 | US27169794 | 07.07.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0768832 | Global Dossier | 24.11.1999 | B1 | EP0768832 | 23.04.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9502574 | 30.06.1995 | US27169794 | 07.07.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9508236 | 23.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9502574 | 30.06.1995 | US27169794 | 07.07.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69513522T | 30.03.2000 | T2 | DE69513522D1 | 30.12.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9502574 | 30.06.1995 | US27169794 | 07.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9601578 | Global Dossier | 25.01.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27169794 | 07.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1124802C | 22.10.2003 | C | CN1156398 | 06.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US27169794 | 07.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2139911T | 16.02.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US27169794 | 07.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5392483 | 28.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US27169794 | 07.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA955508 | 03.01.1997 | B | Priority number | Date | US27169794 | 07.07.1994 |