EP0768832 - MULTI-LEVEL BRISTLE TUFT TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
IT
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINZELMAN, Bert, Davis 17 Sherwood Road Tenafly, NJ 07670 / US | 02 /
LAMOND, Donald, Richard 100 West Broadway Long Beach, NY 11561 / US | 03 /
MOLDAUER, John 310 Clinton Street Brooklyn, NY 11201 / US | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | Kan, Jacob Hendrik, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Kan, Jacob Hendrik, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1999/36] | Kan, Jacob Hendrik, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1997/17] | Rots, Maria Johanna Francisca Unilever PLC, Patent Division, Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95924965.7 | 30.06.1995 | [1997/17] | WO1995EP02574 | Priority number, date | US19940271697 | 07.07.1994 Original published format: US 271697 | [1997/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9601578 | Date: | 25.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0768832 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0768832 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/04 | [1997/17] | CPC: |
A46B9/04 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US);
Y10S15/05 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/17] | Title | German: | ZAHNBÜRSTE MIT BORSTEN AUF MEHREREN EBENEN | [1997/17] | English: | MULTI-LEVEL BRISTLE TUFT TOOTHBRUSH | [1997/17] | French: | BROSSE A DENTS AYANT DES TOUFFES DE POILS A DIFFERENTS NIVEAUX | [1997/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 18.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1901646 (HICKS HARRY W) [Y] 1* page 1, line 61 - page 2, line 21; figure - *; | [YD]US4776054 (RAUCH SAMUEL [US]) [YD] 1 * column 5, line 4 - column 7, line 53; figure - * |