EP0804137 - DETERGENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
IT
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOBLING, Margaret Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Lab Quarry Road, East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside L63 3JW / GB | 02 /
GRIEVESON, Ailsa Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Lab Quarry Road, East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside L63 3JW / GB | 03 /
SHEN, Shiji Unilever Res. U.S, Inc 45 River Road Edgewater, New Jersey 07020 / US | 04 /
TSAUR, Liang Shen Unilever Res. U.S, Inc 45 River Road Edgewater, New Jersey 07020 / US | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95925076.2 | 18.07.1995 | [1997/45] | WO1995GB01690 | Priority number, date | GB19940014574 | 19.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9414574 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9602225 | Date: | 01.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804137 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00, A61K7/50 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
A61K8/442 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (KR);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61K8/8111 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/45] | Title | German: | TENSID ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1997/45] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSITION | [1997/45] | French: | COMPOSITION DETERGENTE | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 29.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/14] | 04.11.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0268982 (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column W *; | [X]EP0407042 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1-10 * column W *; | [X]EP0413417 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1-10 * column W *; | [X]EP0452202 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-10 * column W *; | [A]EP0485212 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-10* column W *; | [X]WO9309761 (RICHARDSON VICKS INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0552024 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * column W *; | [X]WO9319149 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9321293 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO9401084 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9417166 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * |