EP0817601 - TWO PIECE MALE CONDOM CATHETER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MENTOR CORPORATION 5425 Hollister Avenue Santa Barbara, CA 93111 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states MENTOR CORPORATION 5425 Holister Avenue Santa Barbara, CA 93111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEHR, Richard, E. 771 Fischer Circle Stillwater, MN 55082 / US | 02 /
MUNSON, Keith, G. 6599 Kurtz Lane Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US | 03 /
KUBALAK, Thomas, P. 10810 North 38th Place Plymouth, MN 55411 / US | 04 /
WELCH, Daniel, P. Route 3, Box 335B Zimmerman, MN 55398 / US | 05 /
WOESSNER, Roger, J. 1858 Lincoln Avenue St. Paul, MN 55105 / US | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/03] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95925301.4 | 22.06.1995 | [1998/03] | WO1995US07978 | Priority number, date | US19950414182 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: US 414182 | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9629962 | Date: | 03.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0817601 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/453 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
A61F5/453 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1998/03] | Title | German: | ZWEITEILIGER MÄNNLICHER KONDOMKATHETER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1998/03] | English: | TWO PIECE MALE CONDOM CATHETER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE | [1998/03] | French: | CATHETER A CONDOM MALE EN DEUX PARTIES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CE CATHETER | [1998/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/07] | 22.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3520305 (DAVIS RAY D) [Y] 1-3,5 * column 3, line 41 - line 50 * * column 4, line 12 - line 14 * * column 4, line 70 - line 75; figure - *; | [A]GB2048680 (CRAIG MED PROD LTD) [A] 6-12 * page 2, line 7 - line 28; figure - *; | [Y]GB2152380 (DOWNS SURGICAL PLC) [Y] 1-3,5 * abstract *; | [AD]US4626250 (SCHNEIDER BARRY L [US]) [AD] 6-12 * column 5, line 11 - column 7, line 2; figure - *; | [A]EP0335564 (HOLLISTER INC [US]) [A] 6-12 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 42 * * column 5, line 42 - line 44; figure - *; | [E]EP0666070 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [E] 1* column 2, line 47 - line 50 * |