EP0767768 - HALOALKYLATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1765 / US | [1999/13] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1780 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Tse-Chong 12650 Lazy K Avenue Baton Rouge, LA 70810 / US | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95925375.8 | 27.06.1995 | [1997/16] | WO1995US08196 | Priority number, date | US19940266398 | 27.06.1994 Original published format: US 266398 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9600202 | Date: | 04.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0767768 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0767768 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/32, C07B37/04, C07C22/04 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
C07C17/32 (EP,US);
C07C6/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/16] | Title | German: | HALOALKYLIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [1997/16] | English: | HALOALKYLATION PROCESS | [1997/16] | French: | PROCEDE D'HALOALKYLATION | [1997/16] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 22.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0422789 (ETHYL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claim - * |