EP0783398 - RAZOR CARTRIDGES COMPRISING WOUND HEALING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | ||
Former [1997/29] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Alain 31 Country Club Drive Ringoes, NJ 08551 / US | 02 /
VREELAND, William, Elbert 148 Dickenson Drive Shelton, CT 06484 / US | 03 /
BOOTH, Anthony, R. 3 Chesterwoods Drive Chester, NJ 07930 / US | [1997/29] | Representative(s) | Powell, Timothy John Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | Powell, Timothy John Eric Potter Clarkson St. Mary's Gate St. Mary's Court Nottingham NG 1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95925499.6 | 07.07.1995 | [1997/29] | WO1995US08433 | Priority number, date | US19940315734 | 30.09.1994 Original published format: US 315734 | US19950447018 | 22.05.1995 Original published format: US 447018 | [1998/05] |
Former [1997/29] | US19940315734 | 30.09.1994 | |
US19950446989 | 22.05.1995 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9610474 | Date: | 11.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0783398 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0783398 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/44, A61K31/20 | [1997/29] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/29] | Title | German: | RASIERKLINGENEINHEIT MIT WUNDENHEILMITTEL | [1997/29] | English: | RAZOR CARTRIDGES COMPRISING WOUND HEALING COMPOSITIONS | [1997/29] | French: | CARTOUCHES DE RASOIR COMPRENANT DES COMPOSITIONS DE CICATRISATION DE BLESSURES | [1997/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2009017 (WARNER LAMBERT CO) [Y] 1-39 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9215292 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [Y] 1-39 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0348627 (PERMATIK CELIK VE PLASTIK SANA [TR]) [Y] 1 * column W *; | [Y]WO9310776 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * |