EP0782492 - COMPOSITE ABRASIVE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Revocation of patent | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street, Box No. 15138 Worcester Massachusetts 01615-0138 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/28] | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street, Box No. 15138 Worcester, Massachusetts 01615-0138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARDYS, Gary, J. 3 Alpine Court Wynantskill, NY 12198 / US | 02 /
KELLY, Robert, G. 7 Wren Lane Latham, NY 12110 / US | [1997/28] | Representative(s) | Leidescher, Thomas Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Leidescher, Thomas Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Leidescher, Thomas Zimmermann & Partner, Postfach 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/28] | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 95925566.2 | 07.07.1995 | [1997/28] | WO1995US08556 | Priority number, date | US19940310172 | 21.09.1994 Original published format: US 310172 | [1997/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9609140 | Date: | 28.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0782492 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0782492 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/28, B24D5/08, B24D13/14 | [1997/28] | CPC: |
B24D3/002 (EP,US);
B24D3/28 (EP,KR,US);
B24D5/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, SE [1997/28] | Title | German: | VERBUNDSCHLEIFKÖRPER | [1997/28] | English: | COMPOSITE ABRASIVE PRODUCTS | [1997/28] | French: | PRODUITS ABRASIFS COMPOSITES | [1997/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/28] | 14.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2000
03.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul MN 55144-1000 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2000
03.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul MN 55144-1000 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2000
03.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul MN 55144-1000 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2000
03.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE 3M Innovative Properties Company Office of Intellectual Property Counsel P.O. Box 33 427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55 133-3427 / US Opponent's representative VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 27.07.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.01.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.10.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.10.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M11) | 28.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.12.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.12.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.07.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/43] | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 05.03.2007 | Appeal received No. T0398/07 | 08.05.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.07.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 03.12.2001 | Appeal received No. T1252/01 | 07.02.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.07.2003 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [2003/29] | 27.01.2004 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/05] | 05.05.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 10.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.08.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 05.05.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.2004 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2006 | [2007/29] | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6352971 ; | [A]JPH0343156 ; | [A]JPH01115576 ; | [X]EP0318168 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 30 * * example 4; claims 1,2,9 *; | [PX]WO9501241 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [PX] 1,2,5,8 * page 14, line 30 - page 15, line 10 * * page 19, line 3 - line 4 * * page 26, line 33 - page 27, line 36 * * page 29, line 18 - line 28 * * page 35, line 30 - line 32 * * claims 3,7,18 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880727), vol. 12, no. 269, Database accession no. (M - 723), & JP63052971 A 19880307 (DAITOO K.K.) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 14, Database accession no. 91-098582 C14!, & JPH0343156 A 19910225 (TOKYO DIAMOND KOGU) [A] 1,7,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890727), vol. 13, no. 335, Database accession no. (M - 856), & JP01115576 A 19890508 (SANKYO RIKAGAKU K.K.) [A] 1,7 * abstract * |