EP0769926 - Intravascular filtering device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/18] | METHOD OF FORMING MEDICAL DEVICES; INTRAVASCULAR OCCLUSION DEVICES | ||
[2001/44] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ev3 Inc. 4600 Nathan Lane North Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US | [2003/10] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states MICROVENA CORPORATION 1861 Buerkle Road White Bear Lake, MN 55110-5246 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZZOCCHI, Rudy 241 Lansing Island Drive Indian Harbor Beach, Florida 32937 / US | 02 /
CLAUDE, Timothy 445 107th Lane Coon Rapids, MN 55433 / US | 03 /
SEGERMARK, James 3635 Big Fox Road Gem Lake, MN 55110 / US | [2002/42] |
Former [1997/18] | 01 /
MAZZOCCHI, Rudy 1526 Glenbeigh Court Woodbury, MN 55125 / US | ||
02 /
CLAUDE, Timothy 445 107th Lane Coon Rapids, MN 55433 / US | |||
03 /
SEGERMARK, James 3635 Big Fox Road Gem Lake, MN 55110 / US | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Howe, Steven, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [1997/18] | Rackham, Anthony Charles Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 95925591.0 | 10.07.1995 | [1997/18] | WO1995US08613 | Priority number, date | US19940272425 | 08.07.1994 Original published format: US 272425 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9601591 | Date: | 25.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0769926 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0769926 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0769926 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22, A61B17/12 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/12022 (EP,US);
A61F2/0105 (EP,US);
A61B17/0057 (EP);
A61B17/12099 (EP,US);
A61B17/12109 (EP,US);
A61B17/12136 (EP,US);
A61B17/12172 (EP,US);
A61B17/12177 (EP,US);
A61B17/221 (EP,US);
A61F2/011 (EP,US);
B21F45/008 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00575 (EP);
A61B2017/00592 (EP);
A61B2017/00601 (EP);
A61B2017/0061 (EP);
A61B2017/00623 (EP);
A61F2002/016 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [1997/18] | Title | German: | Intravaskuläre Filtereinrichtung | [2001/44] | English: | Intravascular filtering device | [2001/44] | French: | Dispositif de filtrage intravasculaire | [2001/44] |
Former [1997/18] | METHODE ZUR FORMUNG MEDIZINISCHER EINRICHTUNGEN UND INTRAVASKULÄRE EINRICHTUNGEN | ||
Former [1997/18] | METHOD OF FORMING MEDICAL DEVICES; INTRAVASCULAR OCCLUSION DEVICES | ||
Former [1997/18] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX, ET DISPOSITIFS D'OCCLUSION INTRAVASCULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 17.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP02076318.1 / EP1221307 | EP06076214.3 / EP1716821 | EP06076215.0 / EP1695673 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.10.2003
ADMISSIBLE Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa CA 95403 / US Opponent's representative Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.10.2003
ADMISSIBLE Medtronic Vascular Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US Opponent's representative Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | 13.11.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.05.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.06.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.08.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.08.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.12.2005 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.08.2006 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 10.10.2005 | Appeal received No. T1315/05 | 19.12.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | 28.06.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.07.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 08.01.2003 | LI | 08.01.2003 | DK | 08.04.2003 | IE | 10.07.2003 | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/02] | CH | 08.01.2003 | |
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 08.01.2003 | |
LI | 08.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2821048 (RUESCH GMBH & CO KG WILLY) [Y] 1-4,14-16; | [Y]US4425908 (SIMON MORRIS [US])[Y] 14-16; | [Y]US4619246 (MOLGAARD-NIELSEN ARNE [DK], et al) [Y] 1-4,14-16; | [YA]US4832055 (PALESTRANT AUBREY M [US]) [Y] 1-4 [A] 5,10,14-16 | Opposition | US3996938 | US4650466 | US4790812 | US4926858 | EP0391384 | US5071407 | US5329942 | - Dorland's Illustrated Medical Dictionnary | - A Color Atlas of Endovascular Surgery, p.26, 27 | - Diagnostic Angiography, 1986, Kadir Saadoon, W.B Saunders Company, Ch.2:Materials for Catheterization, p.10-15. |