EP0772936 - A CONTROLLER FOR PROVIDING TIMING SIGNALS FOR VIDEO DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Australian Research and Design Corporation Pty Ltd. 24 Manning Street Milton, QLD 4064 / AU | [1997/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JORDAN, Norman, James 502 Mt Crosby Road Anstead, QLD 4073 / AU | 02 /
ARCHBOLD, John, Michael 137 Wilkes Road Hampton, QLD 4352 / AU | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al Dibb Lupton Alsop Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95925662.9 | 25.07.1995 | [1997/20] | WO1995AU00448 | Priority number, date | AU1994PM07004 | 25.07.1994 Original published format: AU PM700494 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603836 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0772936 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 08.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/01, G06F3/153, H04N5/06, H04N9/64 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
G09G1/285 (EP,US);
H04N7/01 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/06 (EP,US);
H04N9/641 (EP,US);
H04N5/04 (EP,US);
H04N5/08 (EP,US);
H04N5/46 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1997/20] | H04N7/01, G06F3/153 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/20] | Extension states | LT | 18.02.1997 | LV | 18.02.1997 | SI | 18.02.1997 | Title | German: | STEUEREINRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON TAKTSIGNALEN FÜR VIDEODATEN | [1997/20] | English: | A CONTROLLER FOR PROVIDING TIMING SIGNALS FOR VIDEO DATA | [1997/20] | French: | CONTROLEUR FOURNISSANT DES SIGNAUX DE SYNCHRONISATION POUR DES DONNEES VIDEO | [1997/20] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 18.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 18.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 25.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 05.11.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 20.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/16] | Appeal following examination | 18.12.2001 | Appeal received No. T0460/02 | 14.03.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.02.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.1997 | 31.07.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1998 | 31.07.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.1999 | 31.07.2003 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 31.07.2004 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]EP0068123 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0484981 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0507159 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0588499 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) |