Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2986395 | Global Dossier | 22.02.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9414770 | 22.07.1994 | GB9510137 | 19.05.1995 | GB9501700 | 19.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0774116 | Global Dossier | 03.11.1999 | B1 | EP0774116 | 21.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9414770 | 22.07.1994 | GB9510137 | 19.05.1995 | GB9501700 | 19.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69513178T | 31.08.2000 | T2 | DE69513178D1 | 09.12.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9414770 | 22.07.1994 | GB9510137 | 19.05.1995 | GB9501700 | 19.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0774116T | 08.05.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9414770 | 22.07.1994 | GB9510137 | 19.05.1995 | GB9501700 | 19.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9414770D0 | 14.09.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9414770 | 22.07.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9510137D0 | 12.07.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9510137 | 19.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9603647 | Global Dossier | 08.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9414770 | 22.07.1994 | GB9510137 | 19.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE186399T | 15.11.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9414770 | 22.07.1994 | GB9510137 | 19.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2139225T | 01.02.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9414770 | 22.07.1994 | GB9510137 | 19.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2291708 | 05.03.1997 | B | GB2291708 | 31.01.1996 | A | GB9514722D0 | 20.09.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9414770 | 22.07.1994 | GB9510137 | 19.05.1995 |