Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0775032
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
06.08.2004 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
30.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] |
19.02.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.04.1999 [1999/14] |
27.02.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] |
05.12.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.09.1997 |
First examination report |
|
16.09.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.04.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] |
11.04.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] |
09.04.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|