EP0774111 - FLUID NOZZLE AND METHOD OF INTRODUCING A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARUE, Roderick, Walton 12322 Fiori Lane Sebastopol, CA 95472 / US | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95926327.8 | 21.07.1995 | [1997/21] | WO1995US09219 | Priority number, date | US19940283379 | 01.08.1994 Original published format: US 283379 | US19940356432 | 15.12.1994 Original published format: US 356432 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9604542 | Date: | 15.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0774111 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774111 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14, G01N35/10 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
G01N35/109 (EP,US);
B01F25/3132 (EP,US);
B01F25/31324 (EP,US);
G01N15/14 (EP,US);
G01N15/1404 (EP,US);
G01N35/0092 (EP,US);
G01N35/1004 (EP,US);
G01N1/14 (EP,US);
G01N2015/014 (EP,US);
G01N2015/018 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1413 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00356 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/21] | Title | German: | FLUIDDÜSE UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINFÜHREN EINES FLUIDS | [2002/25] | English: | FLUID NOZZLE AND METHOD OF INTRODUCING A FLUID | [1997/21] | French: | AJUTAGE POUR FLUIDE ET PROCEDE D'INTRODUCTION D'UN FLUIDE | [1997/21] |
Former [1997/21] | FLUIDDUESE UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINFUHR EINES FLUIDS | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.01.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02021783.2 / EP1271128 | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02213745 ; | [A]JPH01265137 ; | [A]US3795149 (NEGERSMITH K, et al); | [A]GB2077457 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED) [A] 1,8,13,15,17 * page 2, line 100 - page 3, line 100; figure 3 *; | [XA]US4352558 (EISERT WOLFGANG) [X] 1,2,4-7,15-17 * column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 38; figures 1,2 * [A] 8-14; | [XA]EP0425381 (ABX SA [FR]) [X] 1,6,13-17 * column 4 - column 6; figure 1 * [A] 8,10-16 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901109), vol. 014, no. 512, Database accession no. (P - 1129), & JP02213745 A 19900824 (CANON INC) [A] 8-13,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900118), vol. 014, no. 025, Database accession no. (P - 991), & JP01265137 A 19891023 (NIPPON KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] * abstract * |