EP0721936 - LIQUID SOFTENER COMPOSITION AND QUATERNARY AMMONIUM SALT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKATA, Yuushi 4-1, Kinryujicho, Wakayamashi Wakayama 640 / JP | 02 /
INOKOSHI, Junichi 1-1, Minato, Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | 03 /
TACHIZAWA, Osamu 1450, Nishihama, Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641 / JP | 04 /
KATOH, Tohru 1450, Nishihama, Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641 / JP | 05 /
NISHIMOTO, Uichirou 173-5, Ohtani, Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | 06 /
OHTAWA, Yasuki 264-1, Kishimiya, Kishigawacho, Naga-gun Wakayama 640-04 / JP | 07 /
SAKAGUCHI, Akira 551, Marusu, Kishigawacho, Naga-gun Wakayama 640-04 / JP | 08 /
SOTOYA, Kohshiroh 446-26, Nakaguro, Iwadecho, Naga-gun Wakayama 649-62 / JP | 09 /
YAMAGUCHI, Noriko 1450, Nishihama, Wakayamashi Wakayama 641 / JP | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95926513.3 | 27.07.1995 | [1996/29] | WO1995JP01498 | Priority number, date | JP19940175227 | 27.07.1994 Original published format: JP 17522794 | JP19950028196 | 16.02.1995 Original published format: JP 2819695 | [1996/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603370 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721936 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0721936 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/12, C07C229/30, D06M13/463, D06M13/224, D06M13/328 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C07C229/12 (EP,US);
C11D3/0015 (EP,US);
D06M13/463 (EP,US);
D06M2200/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/29] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGE WEICHMACHER UND QUATERNÄRE AMMONIUMSALZE | [1996/29] | English: | LIQUID SOFTENER COMPOSITION AND QUATERNARY AMMONIUM SALT | [1996/29] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR ADOUCISSANT LIQUIDE ET SEL D'AMMONIUM QUATERNAIRE | [1996/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.1996 | Translation filed | 26.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.1996 | Search fee paid | 26.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 16.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 10.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPS54130509 (PROCTER & GAMBLE); | [A]JPH01162872 (PROCTER & GAMBLE); | [A]JPH0390677 (UNILEVER NV) | Examination | CA1111060 |