EP0770245 - OPTIMAL SPLINE INTERPOLATION FOR IMAGE COMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states America Online, Inc. 22000 AOL Way Dulles, VA 20166 / US | [2000/28] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states JOHNSON GRACE COMPANY Suite 150, 2 Corporate Plaza Newport Beach, CA 92260 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REED, Irving, S. 348 15th Street Santa Monica, CA 90402 / US | 02 /
YU, Alfred, C. 9 Gladstone Irvine, CA 92714 / US | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Goodman, Christopher Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95926683.4 | 14.07.1995 | [1997/18] | WO1995US08823 | Priority number, date | US19940275945 | 14.07.1994 Original published format: US 275945 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9602894 | Date: | 01.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0770245 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/36, G06K9/46, G06T9/00 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
G06T9/001 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/18] | G06K9/36, G06K9/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/18] | Title | German: | OPTIMALE SPLINE-INTERPOLATION FÜR BILDKOMPRESSION | [1997/18] | English: | OPTIMAL SPLINE INTERPOLATION FOR IMAGE COMPRESSION | [1997/18] | French: | INTERPOLATION A FONCTION PISTOLET OPTIMALE POUR LA COMPRESSION D'IMAGES | [1997/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 17.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 24.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/32] | 07.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.2001 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.2001 | 31.07.2002 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5262958 (CHUI CHARLES K [US], et al) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [PX] - RATAKONDA K C ET AL, "Flexible image compression: a transformative interpolative approach", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SIGNAL PROCESSING APPLICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY, PROCEEDINGS OF 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SIGNAL PROCESSING APPLICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY, DALLAS, TX, USA, 18-21 OCT. 1994, 1994, WALTHAM, MA, USA, DSP ASSOCIATES, USA, pages 880 - 885 vol.2, XP002046708 [PX] 1-32 * the whole document * | [A] - CHOU J J ET AL, "DATA REDUCTION USING CUBIC RATIONAL B-SPLINES", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, (19920501), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 60 - 68, XP000281874 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/38.135914 | International search | [Y]US5289548 (WILSON DENNIS L [US], et al) | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, Vol. 41, No. 2, February 1993, UNSER et al., "B-Spline Signal Processing: Parts I and II", pages 821-848. |