EP0772647 - POLYACRYLATE RESIN SOLUTIONS WITH IMPROVED COLOUR INDEX AND THEIR USE IN COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/20] | POLYACRYLATE RESIN SOLUTIONS WITH IMPROVED COLOUR INDEX AND THEIR USE | ||
[2003/15] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states BASF Coatings Aktiengesellschaft Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states BASF Lacke und Farben AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÜNNEMANN, Michael Homannstrasse 28 D-48167 Münster / DE | 02 /
RINK, Heinz, Peter Lohöfenerweg 44 D-48153 Münster / DE | 03 /
HOFFMANN, Peter Erlengrund 215 D-48308 Senden / DE | 04 /
BORGHOLTE, Harald Goebenstrasse 34 D-48151 Münster / DE | 05 /
JUNG, Werner-Alfons Uhrwerkerstrasse 55 D-59387 Ascheberg / DE | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/33] |
Former [2003/26] | Fitzner, Ulrich Dres. Fitzner, Münch & Kluin Rechts- und Patentanwälte Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95926869.9 | 13.07.1995 | [1997/20] | WO1995EP02740 | Priority number, date | DE19944426323 | 25.07.1994 Original published format: DE 4426323 | [1997/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603458 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0772647 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772647 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/49] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0772647 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/524, C09D133/06 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
B05D7/532 (EP,US);
C08F8/40 (EP,US);
C08J3/091 (EP,US);
C08K5/524 (EP,US);
C08J2333/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/40, C08F20/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/524, C08L33/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/20] | Title | German: | POLYACRYLATHARZLÖSUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER FARBZAHL UND VERWENDUNG IN ÜBERZUGSMITTELN | [2006/50] | English: | POLYACRYLATE RESIN SOLUTIONS WITH IMPROVED COLOUR INDEX AND THEIR USE IN COATINGS | [2003/15] | French: | SOLUTIONS DE RESINES POLYACRYLATE A INDICE DE COULEUR AMELIORE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS UN REVETEMENT | [2006/50] |
Former [1997/20] | POLYACRYLATHARZLÖSUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER FARBZAHL UND VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [1997/20] | POLYACRYLATE RESIN SOLUTIONS WITH IMPROVED COLOUR INDEX AND THEIR USE | ||
Former [1997/20] | SOLUTIONS DE RESINES POLYACRYLATE A INDICE DE COULEUR AMELIORE ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 29.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2004
10.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Derks, Wilbert, et al, et al Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower Amstelplein 1, 31st Floor 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2004
10.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Derks, Wilbert, et al, et al Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower Amstelplein 1, 31st Floor 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2004/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2004
Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Alferink, Petrus J.T. Akzo Nobel Nederland B.V. Patent & Trademark Dept. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | 08.10.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.06.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.04.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.11.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.11.2006 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.03.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.12.2003 | DK | 03.03.2004 | SE | 03.03.2004 | AT | 13.07.2004 | BE | 31.07.2004 | CH | 31.07.2004 | LI | 31.07.2004 | [2006/13] |
Former [2005/51] | NL | 03.12.2003 | |
DK | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | NL | 03.12.2003 | |
DK | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | NL | 03.12.2003 | |
DK | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | NL | 03.12.2003 | |
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 03.03.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1494375 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [A] 1,3,5 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 7, line 15; claims 1-3 *; | JPS471711 [ ] (TORAY INDS., INC.); | [A]DE3422688 (INSTRUMENTARIUM CORP [FI]) [A] 1,3,4* page 2, line 43 - line 48; example -; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0389292 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8 * page 5, line 56 - page 6, line 5; claims 1,3-7 *; | [A]DE9301866U (BASF) [A] 1-5 * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 4 * * example 1; claims 1-4 * | [A] - "polyamide compositions with uniformly dispersed pigments", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19721030), vol. 77, no. 18, Database accession no. 116167 [A] 1,2,5 * abstract * | Opposition | DE2749576 | DE4133420 | - JP 93-202335 (Translation in English) |