17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
26.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
26.10.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
24.05.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2001 [2001/28] |
12.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |
10.11.2000 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
03.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
27.10.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
22.09.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] |
08.09.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |
08.10.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |
27.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.01.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
13.08.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.06.1998 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
29.05.1998 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
19.05.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.05.1998 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
31.03.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
11.12.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.08.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.08.1997 |
First examination report |
|
06.08.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.03.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] |
21.03.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] |
07.03.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|