EP0771381 - ELECTROMECHANICALLY OPERATED CYLINDER-KEY UNIT FOR LOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SILCA S.p.A. Via Podgora, 20 Zona Industriale I-31029 Vittorio Veneto (Treviso) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states SILCA S.p.A. Via Podgora, 20 Zona Industriale I-31029 Vittorio Veneto (Treviso) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIES, Ezio Via Caronelli, 37/8 I-31014 Colle Umberto / IT | 02 /
DASSI, Luciano Via Monte Marmolada, 3 I-31015 Conegliano / IT | 03 /
GALLOCCHIO, Vanni Via Monte Lozzo, 15 I-35031 Abano Terme / IT | 04 /
BOTTEON, Renato Via Buozzi, 33 I-31029 Vittorio Veneto / IT | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Piovesana, Paolo c/o Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A.- Venezia Via Francesco Baracca, 5/A 30173 Venezia-Mestre / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | Piovesana, Paolo Corso del Popolo, 70 30172 Venezia-Mestre / IT | Application number, filing date | 95926877.2 | 14.07.1995 | [1997/19] | WO1995EP02758 | Priority number, date | IT1994VE00032 | 15.07.1994 Original published format: IT VE940032 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9602721 | Date: | 01.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0771381 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0771381 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E05B47/06 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
E05B47/063 (EP);
E05B47/0642 (EP);
E05B2047/0062 (EP);
E05B47/0004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/19] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCH BEDIENBARE SCHLÜSSELZYLINDEREINHEIT FÜR SCHLÖSSER | [1997/19] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICALLY OPERATED CYLINDER-KEY UNIT FOR LOCKS | [1997/19] | French: | UNITE DE CYLINDRE ET DE CLE A COMMANDE ELECTROMECANIQUE POUR SERRURES | [1997/19] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 15.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 26.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/45] | Request for further processing for: | 11.05.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 27.04.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.06.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.1999 | BE | 24.11.1999 | CH | 24.11.1999 | ES | 24.11.1999 | FR | 24.11.1999 | GR | 24.11.1999 | LI | 24.11.1999 | NL | 24.11.1999 | SE | 24.11.1999 | DK | 24.02.2000 | PT | 24.02.2000 | GB | 14.07.2000 | IE | 14.07.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
BE | 24.11.1999 | ||
CH | 24.11.1999 | ||
ES | 24.11.1999 | ||
GR | 24.11.1999 | ||
LI | 24.11.1999 | ||
NL | 24.11.1999 | ||
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
DK | 24.02.2000 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
GB | 14.07.2000 | ||
IE | 14.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
BE | 24.11.1999 | ||
CH | 24.11.1999 | ||
ES | 24.11.1999 | ||
LI | 24.11.1999 | ||
NL | 24.11.1999 | ||
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
DK | 24.02.2000 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
GB | 14.07.2000 | ||
IE | 14.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
BE | 24.11.1999 | ||
CH | 24.11.1999 | ||
ES | 24.11.1999 | ||
LI | 24.11.1999 | ||
NL | 24.11.1999 | ||
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
GB | 14.07.2000 | ||
IE | 14.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
BE | 24.11.1999 | ||
CH | 24.11.1999 | ||
ES | 24.11.1999 | ||
LI | 24.11.1999 | ||
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
GB | 14.07.2000 | ||
IE | 14.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
BE | 24.11.1999 | ||
CH | 24.11.1999 | ||
LI | 24.11.1999 | ||
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
GB | 14.07.2000 | ||
IE | 14.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
BE | 24.11.1999 | ||
CH | 24.11.1999 | ||
LI | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
GB | 14.07.2000 | ||
IE | 14.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/28] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
BE | 24.11.1999 | ||
CH | 24.11.1999 | ||
LI | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
GB | 14.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
BE | 24.11.1999 | ||
CH | 24.11.1999 | ||
LI | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
BE | 24.11.1999 | ||
CH | 24.11.1999 | ||
LI | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
BE | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 24.11.1999 | |
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 24.11.1999 | |
PT | 24.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2040351 (GROUP NH LTD) [A] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR2500520 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]AT392507B (EVVA WERKE [AT]) [A] 1,7-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0452298 (GRUNDMANN GMBH GEB [AT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0462316 (FLIETHER KARL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4207160 (WINKHAUS) [A] 1-3 * column 5, line 25 - line 57 *; | [DA]US5265452 (DAWSON GERALD L [US], et al) |