EP0773874 - AN IMPLEMENT FOR SUPPORTING PAINT-ROLLER SLEEVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taylor, David Brian Unit 1d Oldmixon Crescent Weston Super Mare Avon BS24 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states Taylor, David Brian Unit 1d Oldmixon Crescent Weston Super Mare, Avon BS24 9AX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Bryer, Kenneth Robert Bryers LLP 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Bryer, Kenneth Robert K.R. Bryer & Co. 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | ||
Former [1997/21] | Bryer, Kenneth Robert K.R. Bryer & Co. Lewins House Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95927016.6 | 26.07.1995 | [1997/21] | WO1995GB01769 | Priority number, date | GB19940015201 | 28.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9415201 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603287 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773874 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773874 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B44D3/00, B05C17/02 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
B44D3/006 (EP,US);
B05C17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/21] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM BEFESTIGEN VON FARBROLLERBEZÜGEN | [1997/21] | English: | AN IMPLEMENT FOR SUPPORTING PAINT-ROLLER SLEEVES | [1997/21] | French: | ACCESSOIRE DESTINE A SOUTENIR DES MANCHONS DE ROULEAU A PEINTURE | [1997/21] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 09.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 26.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Request for further processing for: | 12.11.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.1999 | 31.07.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.05.2000 | ES | 17.05.2000 | FR | 17.05.2000 | IT | 17.05.2000 | NL | 17.05.2000 | SE | 17.08.2000 | DE | 18.08.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/35] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
ES | 17.05.2000 | ||
FR | 17.05.2000 | ||
NL | 17.05.2000 | ||
SE | 17.08.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
ES | 17.05.2000 | ||
NL | 17.05.2000 | ||
SE | 17.08.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
ES | 17.05.2000 | ||
SE | 17.08.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
SE | 17.08.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
SE | 17.08.2000 | ||
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | BE | 17.05.2000 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2693387 (FRANCAISE METALLURG [FR]) [X] 1,3,7,9,11,13 * page 2, line 15 - page 10, line 5 *; | [A]WO9200200 (TUNKIN RONALD EDWARD [GB]) [A] 1-3,7 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4130443 (DULIN HENRY) [A] 1-3,7 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 67 *; | [A]US5238012 (CORONATO MARIO C [US]) [A] 1-3,7 * column 2, line 9 - column 5, line 25 * |