EP0724772 - ELECTRIC LAMP COATED WITH AN INTERFERENCE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULDER, Cornelis, Antonius, Maria Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN DE SPIJKER, Willibrordus, Hubertus, M. M. Groenewoudseweg 1; NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VISSER, Cornelis, Gerardus Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | van Wermeskerken, Stephanie Christine, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | van Wermeskerken, Stephanie Christine, et al International Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/03] | Mulder, Cornelis A.M., et al P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/01] | Mulder, Cornelis Willem Reinier, Dr., et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1999/23] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/32] | Rooda, Hans INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 95927048.9 | 16.08.1995 | [1996/32] | WO1995IB00650 | Priority number, date | EP19940202397 | 22.08.1994 Original published format: EP 94202397 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9606453 | Date: | 29.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724772 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724772 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01K1/32, // H01J5/08, G02B5/28 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
H01K1/28 (EP,US);
C23C16/401 (EP,US);
C23C16/405 (EP,US);
G02B5/285 (EP,US);
H01J5/08 (EP,US);
H01J61/34 (EP,US);
H01J61/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/32] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE LAMPE BESCHICHTET MIT EINEM INTERFERENZFILM | [1996/32] | English: | ELECTRIC LAMP COATED WITH AN INTERFERENCE FILM | [1996/32] | French: | LAMPE ELECTRIQUE RECOUVERTE D'UN FILM D'INTERFERENCE | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 08.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.01.2003 | [2008/06] | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2183363 (TOSHIBA KK); | [X]US4701663 (KAWAKATSU AKIRA [JP], et al); | [Y]US5138219 (KRISL M ERIC [US], et al) | [Y] - IEE PROCEEDINGS-A, Volume 140, No. 6, November 1993, JAMES R. COATON, "Editorial Light Sources", page 417 - page 428. |