Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9638925 | Global Dossier | 05.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45769795 | 01.06.1995 | US54481595 | 18.10.1995 | US51365895 | 11.08.1995 | US64534896 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9524074 | Global Dossier | 08.09.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9517724 | Global Dossier | 29.06.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19739294 | 16.02.1994 | US23818094 | 04.05.1994 | US17012193 | 20.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9512942 | Global Dossier | 11.05.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9427382 | Global Dossier | 24.11.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8566293 | 29.06.1993 | US6245793 | 11.05.1993 | US19840494 | 22.02.1994 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US19845294 | 18.02.1994 | US7634093 | 11.06.1993 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9426038 | Global Dossier | 10.11.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9419736 | Global Dossier | 01.09.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9415413 | Global Dossier | 07.07.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9410774 | Global Dossier | 11.05.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US97323792 | 09.11.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9325955 | Global Dossier | 23.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89890892 | 12.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9307691 | Global Dossier | 15.04.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9302428 | Global Dossier | 04.02.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88109692 | 11.05.1992 | US82007092 | 10.01.1992 | US77769191 | 10.10.1991 | US73561091 | 23.07.1991 | US78680291 | 05.11.1991 | US91369392 | 14.07.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9215073 | Global Dossier | 03.09.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US83571892 | 12.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9210803 | Global Dossier | 25.06.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9202084 | Global Dossier | 06.02.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9111065 | Global Dossier | 25.07.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9016033 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2004 | A8 | WO9016033 | 27.12.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005048580 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2005 | A3 | WO2005048580 | 26.05.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70189503 | 05.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7322526 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2008 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US30245405 | 13.12.2005 | US77602704 | 10.02.2004 | US19809798 | 23.11.1998 | US23870188 | 31.08.1988 | US97282292 | 06.11.1992 | US61660290 | 21.11.1990 | US34526894 | 28.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6974085 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US77602704 | 10.02.2004 | US19809798 | 23.11.1998 | US23870188 | 31.08.1988 | US97282292 | 06.11.1992 | US61660290 | 21.11.1990 | US34526894 | 28.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6889903 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US47622695 | 07.06.1995 | US4168702 | 08.01.2002 | US66344403 | 16.09.2003 | US19809798 | 23.11.1998 | US23870188 | 31.08.1988 | US97282292 | 06.11.1992 | US61660290 | 21.11.1990 | US89240501 | 27.06.2001 | US75237096 | 19.11.1996 | US14916998 | 08.09.1998 | US34526894 | 28.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022060773 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117514103 | 29.10.2021 | US201916718927 | 18.12.2019 | US202117222520 | 05.04.2021 | US201815873561 | 17.01.2018 | US70189503 | 05.11.2003 | US201514819718 | 06.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9906825 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2018 | B2 | US2016073147 | 10.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70189503 | 05.11.2003 | US201514819718 | 06.08.2015 | US70186503 | 05.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012269186 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78337504 | 20.02.2004 | US14150508 | 18.06.2008 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | US201113267150 | 06.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011085484 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72849410 | 22.03.2010 | US69608696 | 13.08.1996 | US49749906 | 01.08.2006 | US19739294 | 16.02.1994 | US23818094 | 04.05.1994 | US77289596 | 24.12.1996 | US64870703 | 26.08.2003 | US87835797 | 27.06.1997 | US17012193 | 20.12.1993 | US35742999 | 20.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7973728 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2011 | B2 | US2011037681 | 17.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23250905 | 22.09.2005 | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US25534108 | 21.10.2008 | US94753107 | 29.11.2007 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US80030204 | 12.03.2004 | US91207510 | 26.10.2010 | US656698 | 13.01.1998 | US53449706 | 22.09.2006 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011007733 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US84027610 | 20.07.2010 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | US78388304 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8526329 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2013 | B2 | US2011007724 | 13.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US73606803 | 15.12.2003 | US23637208 | 23.09.2008 | US83266910 | 08.07.2010 | US12944898 | 04.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010329166 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19840494 | 22.02.1994 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US85569007 | 14.09.2007 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US19845294 | 18.02.1994 | US73606803 | 15.12.2003 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US12944898 | 04.08.1998 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | US87783710 | 08.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010282852 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95534597 | 21.10.1997 | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US48128100 | 10.01.2000 | US83990610 | 20.07.2010 | US59791700 | 19.06.2000 | US45988406 | 25.07.2006 | US62261703 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7912043 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2011 | B2 | US2010260110 | 14.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80147204 | 16.03.2004 | US77743610 | 11.05.2010 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010260063 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75996904 | 16.01.2004 | US75950110 | 13.04.2010 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010232323 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74932010 | 29.03.2010 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | US82244704 | 08.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7894423 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2011 | B2 | US2010232312 | 16.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78347704 | 20.02.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US68619510 | 12.01.2010 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | US72782510 | 19.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7856003 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2010 | B2 | US2010189090 | 29.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72849410 | 22.03.2010 | US69608696 | 13.08.1996 | US49749906 | 01.08.2006 | US19739294 | 16.02.1994 | US23818094 | 04.05.1994 | US77289596 | 24.12.1996 | US64870703 | 26.08.2003 | US87835797 | 27.06.1997 | US17012193 | 20.12.1993 | US35742999 | 20.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7920496 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2011 | B2 | US2010167782 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US71599110 | 02.03.2010 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US65118803 | 28.08.2003 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US49932895 | 07.07.1995 | US9405037 | 06.05.1994 | US25826708 | 24.10.2008 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US23926794 | 06.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010158077 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9609474 | 03.06.1996 | US68465003 | 14.10.2003 | US97319500 | 06.03.2000 | US72023110 | 09.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7936713 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2011 | B2 | US2010142518 | 10.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78347704 | 20.02.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US68619510 | 12.01.2010 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7848316 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2010 | B2 | US2010142503 | 10.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63838609 | 15.12.2009 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US76005704 | 16.01.2004 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010118864 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60590309 | 26.10.2009 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | US78389404 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010105444 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60907800 | 30.06.2000 | US18818302 | 02.07.2002 | US16739505 | 27.06.2005 | US27755994 | 19.07.1994 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US73517496 | 22.10.1996 | US65250310 | 05.01.2010 | US7155593 | 04.06.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8194595 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2012 | B2 | US2010080182 | 01.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US54734809 | 25.08.2009 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | US76016704 | 16.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010041349 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58210409 | 20.10.2009 | US79934001 | 05.03.2001 | US91086592 | 06.07.1992 | US93445701 | 21.08.2001 | US5781602 | 24.01.2002 | US27010794 | 30.06.1994 | US55144295 | 01.11.1995 | EP89114386 | 03.08.1989 | US47655095 | 06.06.1995 | US86430092 | 06.04.1992 | US12387698 | 28.07.1998 | US97323792 | 09.11.1992 | US98094792 | 26.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7768951 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2010 | B2 | US2009323680 | 31.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55568009 | 08.09.2009 | US78388804 | 20.02.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009323589 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US48987409 | 23.06.2009 | US6028798 | 14.04.1998 | US65759503 | 08.09.2003 | US12387302 | 16.04.2002 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | US39555595 | 28.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009322277 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98498092 | 30.11.1992 | US92148597 | 02.09.1997 | US28932294 | 11.08.1994 | US49253509 | 26.06.2009 | US69135203 | 22.10.2003 | US64640596 | 07.05.1996 | US11178308 | 29.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009303920 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50097796 | 04.04.1996 | US54170309 | 14.08.2009 | US98229292 | 27.11.1992 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US95943297 | 28.10.1997 | US10143602 | 19.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009296677 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50097796 | 04.04.1996 | US98229292 | 27.11.1992 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US54167009 | 14.08.2009 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US95943297 | 28.10.1997 | US10143602 | 19.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009252136 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US72393000 | 28.11.2000 | US48222509 | 10.06.2009 | US12944898 | 04.08.1998 | US85566007 | 14.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7873343 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2011 | B2 | US2009247241 | 01.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US94710292 | 14.09.1992 | US46869809 | 19.05.2009 | US63013803 | 29.07.2003 | US9203982 | 13.05.1992 | US90792792 | 30.06.1992 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US31866899 | 25.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7992788 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2011 | B2 | US2009238319 | 24.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US95534597 | 21.10.1997 | US48128100 | 10.01.2000 | US59791700 | 19.06.2000 | US47224109 | 26.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7918401 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2011 | B2 | US2009175318 | 09.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34511306 | 31.01.2006 | US46725599 | 20.12.1999 | US33036208 | 08.12.2008 | US80910804 | 25.03.2004 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | US41963606 | 22.05.2006 | US23926794 | 06.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009172189 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US96599104 | 15.10.2004 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US41059295 | 27.03.1995 | US54242400 | 04.04.2000 | US36038309 | 27.01.2009 | US6612598 | 24.04.1998 | US54383896 | 16.02.1996 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7953444 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2011 | B2 | US2009167618 | 02.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96019497 | 29.10.1997 | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US632504 | 07.12.2004 | US43107795 | 27.04.1995 | US40152695 | 10.03.1995 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | US34268108 | 23.12.2008 | US61999000 | 20.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7917145 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2011 | B2 | US2009092070 | 09.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US6028798 | 14.04.1998 | US12387302 | 16.04.2002 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | US32303608 | 25.11.2008 | US63107103 | 31.07.2003 | US39555595 | 28.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7969911 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2011 | B2 | US2009080398 | 26.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US73606803 | 15.12.2003 | US23637208 | 23.09.2008 | US12944898 | 04.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8139749 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2012 | B2 | US2009059903 | 05.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26085008 | 29.10.2008 | US78337504 | 20.02.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7821464 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2010 | B2 | US2009054099 | 26.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23250905 | 22.09.2005 | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US25534108 | 21.10.2008 | US94753107 | 29.11.2007 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US80030204 | 12.03.2004 | US656698 | 13.01.1998 | US53449706 | 22.09.2006 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7672257 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2010 | B2 | US2009046609 | 19.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98229292 | 27.11.1992 | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US19845294 | 18.02.1994 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US65118803 | 28.08.2003 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | US8566293 | 29.06.1993 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US6245793 | 11.05.1993 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US49932895 | 07.07.1995 | US9405037 | 06.05.1994 | US25826708 | 24.10.2008 | US7634093 | 11.06.1993 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | US23926794 | 06.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7899951 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2011 | B2 | US2009046602 | 19.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19316808 | 18.08.2008 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US94710292 | 14.09.1992 | US90792792 | 30.06.1992 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US39555595 | 28.02.1995 | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US933804 | 09.12.2004 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US9203982 | 13.05.1992 | US6028798 | 14.04.1998 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | US12387302 | 16.04.2002 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7899007 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2011 | B2 | US2009034454 | 05.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78337504 | 20.02.2004 | US25120808 | 14.10.2008 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8228879 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2012 | B2 | US2009022304 | 22.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78337504 | 20.02.2004 | US14150508 | 18.06.2008 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009015194 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33933089 | 14.04.1989 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US92148597 | 02.09.1997 | US28932294 | 11.08.1994 | US92144992 | 28.07.1992 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US70795491 | 22.05.1991 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US98498092 | 30.11.1992 | US69135203 | 22.10.2003 | US64640596 | 07.05.1996 | US11178308 | 29.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7916747 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2011 | B2 | US2008285489 | 20.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48219700 | 12.01.2000 | US27053394 | 05.07.1994 | US91086592 | 06.07.1992 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US84977601 | 04.05.2001 | US88385492 | 13.05.1992 | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US82696092 | 24.01.1992 | US76274604 | 22.01.2004 | US96026501 | 21.09.2001 | US86430092 | 06.04.1992 | US94149697 | 30.09.1997 | US98094792 | 26.05.1992 | US12153608 | 15.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7853254 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2010 | B2 | US2008274731 | 06.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US62224103 | 18.07.2003 | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US95534597 | 21.10.1997 | US48128100 | 10.01.2000 | US59791700 | 19.06.2000 | US13236308 | 03.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7916706 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2011 | B2 | US2008165767 | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US68259103 | 09.10.2003 | US4801708 | 13.03.2008 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7471253 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2008 | B2 | US2008076468 | 27.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23250905 | 22.09.2005 | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US94753107 | 29.11.2007 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US80030204 | 12.03.2004 | US656698 | 13.01.1998 | US53449706 | 22.09.2006 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7583639 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2009 | B2 | US2008025378 | 31.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19840494 | 22.02.1994 | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US19845294 | 18.02.1994 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US12944898 | 04.08.1998 | US85566007 | 14.09.2007 | US8566293 | 29.06.1993 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US6245793 | 11.05.1993 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US7634093 | 11.06.1993 | US72393000 | 28.11.2000 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7804849 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2010 | B2 | US2008025235 | 31.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19840494 | 22.02.1994 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US85569007 | 14.09.2007 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US19845294 | 18.02.1994 | US73606803 | 15.12.2003 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US12944898 | 04.08.1998 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007293258 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US5721893 | 04.05.1993 | US27794494 | 29.06.1994 | US97274901 | 08.10.2001 | US73588007 | 16.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7586907 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2009 | B2 | US2007177584 | 02.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82246204 | 12.04.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US60497606 | 28.11.2006 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7633919 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2009 | B2 | US2007121529 | 31.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48219700 | 12.01.2000 | US7279198 | 05.05.1998 | US27053394 | 05.07.1994 | US49490995 | 26.06.1995 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US84977601 | 04.05.2001 | US39555595 | 28.02.1995 | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US8995098 | 03.06.1998 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US14425002 | 13.05.2002 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US55241206 | 24.10.2006 | US6028798 | 14.04.1998 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | US94149697 | 30.09.1997 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US53188000 | 21.03.2000 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US78012496 | 26.12.1996 | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | US96026501 | 21.09.2001 | US5890593 | 06.05.1993 | US7314293 | 04.06.1993 | US12387302 | 16.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7646941 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2010 | B2 | US2007065046 | 22.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18977898 | 10.11.1998 | US21511594 | 17.03.1994 | US47547206 | 27.06.2006 | US8546802 | 28.02.2002 | US41516989 | 29.09.1989 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US43822095 | 09.05.1995 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US71784100 | 21.11.2000 | US89754786 | 15.08.1986 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US79032897 | 28.01.1997 | US27509694 | 14.07.1994 | US13577198 | 18.08.1998 | US77739392 | 07.01.1992 | US36001494 | 20.12.1994 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US67475691 | 25.03.1991 | US98757492 | 08.12.1992 | US30607394 | 14.09.1994 | US85248092 | 17.03.1992 | US47848895 | 07.06.1995 | US4031393 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7312759 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2007 | B2 | US2007018897 | 25.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23250905 | 22.09.2005 | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US53449706 | 22.09.2006 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US80030204 | 12.03.2004 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US656698 | 13.01.1998 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007007353 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US91291792 | 13.07.1992 | US21511594 | 17.03.1994 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US82007092 | 10.01.1992 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US73561091 | 23.07.1991 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US90577986 | 10.09.1986 | US71784100 | 21.11.2000 | US89754786 | 15.08.1986 | US44100789 | 21.11.1989 | US7777691 | 10.10.1991 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US71973191 | 24.06.1991 | US42613589 | 24.10.1989 | US96598392 | 23.10.1992 | US78680291 | 05.11.1991 | US56199490 | 31.07.1990 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US88109692 | 11.05.1992 | US67475691 | 25.03.1991 | US98757492 | 08.12.1992 | US35244106 | 08.02.2006 | US96052092 | 13.10.1992 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US34784989 | 03.05.1989 | US4031393 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7757956 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2010 | B2 | US2007001007 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US95534597 | 21.10.1997 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US59791700 | 19.06.2000 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US45988406 | 25.07.2006 | US83571892 | 12.02.1992 | US62261703 | 18.07.2003 | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US48128100 | 10.01.2000 | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US89890892 | 12.06.1992 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US7155593 | 04.06.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7336853 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2008 | B2 | US2006291752 | 28.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66345303 | 16.09.2003 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US79032897 | 28.01.1997 | US35244006 | 08.02.2006 | US27509694 | 14.07.1994 | US41516989 | 29.09.1989 | US30607394 | 14.09.1994 | US13577198 | 18.08.1998 | US85248092 | 17.03.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7710935 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2010 | B2 | US2006270339 | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69608696 | 13.08.1996 | US9609474 | 03.06.1996 | US49749906 | 01.08.2006 | US19739294 | 16.02.1994 | US23818094 | 04.05.1994 | US77289596 | 24.12.1996 | US64870703 | 26.08.2003 | US87835797 | 27.06.1997 | US17012193 | 20.12.1993 | US35742999 | 20.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7710907 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2010 | B2 | US2006270338 | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69608696 | 13.08.1996 | US9609474 | 03.06.1996 | US49695006 | 01.08.2006 | US19739294 | 16.02.1994 | US23818094 | 04.05.1994 | US77289596 | 24.12.1996 | US64870703 | 26.08.2003 | US87835797 | 27.06.1997 | US17012193 | 20.12.1993 | US35742999 | 20.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006268807 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US16222902 | 04.06.2002 | US7279198 | 05.05.1998 | US27053394 | 05.07.1994 | US49490995 | 26.06.1995 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US53188000 | 21.03.2000 | US47542406 | 27.06.2006 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US78012496 | 26.12.1996 | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US8995098 | 03.06.1998 | US13614605 | 24.05.2005 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | US5890593 | 06.05.1993 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | US7314293 | 04.06.1993 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006268806 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US96599104 | 15.10.2004 | US47490706 | 26.06.2006 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US41059295 | 27.03.1995 | US54242400 | 04.04.2000 | US6612598 | 24.04.1998 | US54383896 | 16.02.1996 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7510121 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2009 | B2 | US2006233161 | 19.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34511306 | 31.01.2006 | US46725599 | 20.12.1999 | US52935390 | 25.05.1990 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US80910804 | 25.03.2004 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US41963606 | 22.05.2006 | US23926794 | 06.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006227739 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19840494 | 22.02.1994 | US46725599 | 20.12.1999 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US50097796 | 04.04.1996 | US8566293 | 29.06.1993 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US9405037 | 06.05.1994 | US87977692 | 06.05.1992 | US7982292 | 27.11.1992 | US41956506 | 22.05.2006 | US7634093 | 11.06.1993 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | US23926794 | 06.05.1994 | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US19845294 | 18.02.1994 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US95943297 | 28.10.1997 | US10143602 | 19.03.2002 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US6245793 | 11.05.1993 | US52935390 | 25.05.1990 | US49932895 | 07.07.1995 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006215591 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US95943297 | 28.10.1997 | US10143602 | 19.03.2002 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | US50097796 | 04.04.1996 | US52935390 | 25.05.1990 | US7982292 | 27.11.1992 | US41959806 | 22.05.2006 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006209777 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US95943297 | 28.10.1997 | US10143602 | 19.03.2002 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | US50097796 | 04.04.1996 | US52935390 | 25.05.1990 | US7982292 | 27.11.1992 | US41957606 | 22.05.2006 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006182074 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9245098 | 05.06.1998 | US9609474 | 03.06.1996 | US91131897 | 14.08.1997 | US76545104 | 27.01.2004 | US28802405 | 28.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006131420 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34511306 | 31.01.2006 | US46725599 | 20.12.1999 | US52935390 | 25.05.1990 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US80910804 | 25.03.2004 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US23926794 | 06.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7548553 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2009 | B2 | US2006062240 | 23.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US48219700 | 12.01.2000 | US76274604 | 22.01.2004 | US27053394 | 05.07.1994 | US96026501 | 21.09.2001 | US22340405 | 09.09.2005 | US94149697 | 30.09.1997 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US84977601 | 04.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7119750 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2006 | B2 | US2006012531 | 19.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23250905 | 22.09.2005 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US80030204 | 12.03.2004 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US656698 | 13.01.1998 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7535921 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2009 | B2 | US2006007951 | 12.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22291505 | 09.09.2005 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US48219700 | 12.01.2000 | US76274604 | 22.01.2004 | US27053394 | 05.07.1994 | US96026501 | 21.09.2001 | US94149697 | 30.09.1997 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US84977601 | 04.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7912016 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2011 | B2 | US2005254475 | 17.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18370405 | 18.07.2005 | US70642503 | 12.11.2003 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7641117 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2010 | B2 | US2005242192 | 03.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60907800 | 30.06.2000 | US18818302 | 02.07.2002 | US16739505 | 27.06.2005 | US27755994 | 19.07.1994 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US73517496 | 22.10.1996 | US7155593 | 04.06.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005232213 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US16222902 | 04.06.2002 | US7279198 | 05.05.1998 | US27053394 | 05.07.1994 | US49490995 | 26.06.1995 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US53188000 | 21.03.2000 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US78012496 | 26.12.1996 | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US8995098 | 03.06.1998 | US13614605 | 24.05.2005 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | US5890593 | 06.05.1993 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | US7314293 | 04.06.1993 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7609747 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2009 | B2 | US2005195859 | 08.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99664304 | 22.11.2004 | US27010794 | 30.06.1994 | US36059103 | 06.02.2003 | US79934001 | 05.03.2001 | EP89114386 | 03.08.1989 | US11263405 | 22.04.2005 | US47655095 | 06.06.1995 | US12387698 | 28.07.1998 | US97323792 | 09.11.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7142535 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2006 | B2 | US2005152319 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82246204 | 12.04.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7469150 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2008 | B2 | US2005119029 | 02.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96019497 | 29.10.1997 | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US632504 | 07.12.2004 | US43107795 | 27.04.1995 | US40152695 | 10.03.1995 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | US61999000 | 20.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7415548 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2008 | B2 | US2005102443 | 12.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US94710292 | 14.09.1992 | US90792792 | 30.06.1992 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US39555595 | 28.02.1995 | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US933804 | 09.12.2004 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US9203982 | 13.05.1992 | US6028798 | 14.04.1998 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | US12387302 | 16.04.2002 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9136956 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2015 | B2 | US2005096978 | 05.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70189503 | 05.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005089084 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99664304 | 22.11.2004 | US27010794 | 30.06.1994 | US36059103 | 06.02.2003 | US79934001 | 05.03.2001 | EP89114386 | 03.08.1989 | US47655095 | 06.06.1995 | US12387698 | 28.07.1998 | US97323792 | 09.11.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7712669 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2010 | B2 | US2005087603 | 28.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US64631803 | 22.08.2003 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US77739392 | 07.01.1992 | US36001494 | 20.12.1994 | US47848895 | 07.06.1995 | US4031393 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7552246 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2009 | B2 | US2005086399 | 21.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US94710292 | 14.09.1992 | US90792792 | 30.06.1992 | US65759503 | 08.09.2003 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US39555595 | 28.02.1995 | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US9203982 | 13.05.1992 | US6028798 | 14.04.1998 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | US12387302 | 16.04.2002 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7933252 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2011 | B2 | US2005083872 | 21.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US78387304 | 20.02.2004 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7483397 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2009 | B2 | US2005078647 | 14.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US96599104 | 15.10.2004 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US41059295 | 27.03.1995 | US54242400 | 04.04.2000 | US6612598 | 24.04.1998 | US54383896 | 16.02.1996 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005048963 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9245098 | 05.06.1998 | US9609474 | 03.06.1996 | US91131897 | 14.08.1997 | US76545104 | 27.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7920553 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2011 | B2 | US2005036467 | 17.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78357204 | 20.02.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8018907 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2011 | B2 | US2005013266 | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US83937304 | 05.05.2004 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7715375 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2010 | B2 | US2005008002 | 13.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80147204 | 16.03.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7688811 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2010 | B2 | US2004264442 | 30.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | US82244704 | 08.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7586861 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2009 | B2 | US2004246940 | 09.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78388804 | 20.02.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6961312 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2005 | B2 | US2004228330 | 18.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US78400504 | 20.02.2004 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7672674 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2010 | B2 | US2004203834 | 14.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38972789 | 04.08.1989 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US70795491 | 22.05.1991 | US88385492 | 13.05.1992 | US93445701 | 21.08.2001 | US5781602 | 24.01.2002 | US27010794 | 30.06.1994 | US82696092 | 24.01.1992 | US55144295 | 01.11.1995 | EP89114386 | 03.08.1989 | US12387698 | 28.07.1998 | US97323792 | 09.11.1992 | US83302304 | 27.04.2004 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US79934001 | 05.03.2001 | US22835588 | 04.08.1988 | US91086592 | 06.07.1992 | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US48531390 | 26.02.1990 | US80097791 | 02.12.1991 | US76501391 | 24.09.1991 | US47655095 | 06.06.1995 | US86430092 | 06.04.1992 | US72725691 | 09.07.1991 | US98094792 | 26.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7004395 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2006 | B2 | US2004182936 | 23.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46725599 | 20.12.1999 | US52935390 | 25.05.1990 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US80910804 | 25.03.2004 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US23926794 | 06.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7760703 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2010 | B2 | US2004174843 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | US78388304 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7646743 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2010 | B2 | US2004174842 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78347704 | 20.02.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7460507 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2008 | B2 | US2004174841 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78337504 | 20.02.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6980161 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2005 | B2 | US2004174307 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US80030204 | 12.03.2004 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US656698 | 13.01.1998 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7386002 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2008 | B2 | US2004169583 | 02.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48219700 | 12.01.2000 | US27053394 | 05.07.1994 | US91086592 | 06.07.1992 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US84977601 | 04.05.2001 | US88385492 | 13.05.1992 | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US69981591 | 13.05.1991 | US76274604 | 22.01.2004 | US96026501 | 21.09.2001 | US94149697 | 30.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8509260 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2013 | B2 | US2004166895 | 26.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19840494 | 22.02.1994 | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US19845294 | 18.02.1994 | US19738694 | 16.02.1994 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US51365895 | 11.08.1995 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US78744304 | 26.02.2004 | US43107795 | 27.04.1995 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US9405037 | 06.05.1994 | US40152695 | 10.03.1995 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US26775894 | 05.07.1994 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004165793 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66345303 | 16.09.2003 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US79032897 | 28.01.1997 | US27509694 | 14.07.1994 | US41516989 | 29.09.1989 | US30607394 | 14.09.1994 | US13577198 | 18.08.1998 | US85248092 | 17.03.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004165573 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US78343704 | 20.02.2004 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004162889 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77913604 | 13.02.2004 | US93574197 | 23.09.1997 | US74815091 | 21.08.1991 | US26775894 | 05.07.1994 | US52013695 | 28.08.1995 | US51992100 | 07.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004160913 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | US78389404 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8238264 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2012 | B2 | US2004160912 | 19.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78358704 | 20.02.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8467376 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2013 | B2 | US2004151164 | 05.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US76032204 | 16.01.2004 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7580384 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2009 | B2 | US2004151151 | 05.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | US76016704 | 16.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7633934 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2009 | B2 | US2004151150 | 05.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US76005704 | 16.01.2004 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7697467 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2010 | B2 | US2004146037 | 29.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75996904 | 16.01.2004 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8149825 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2012 | B2 | US2004146020 | 29.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US76003504 | 16.01.2004 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004145775 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70642503 | 12.11.2003 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7440416 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2008 | B2 | US2004125753 | 01.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US73606803 | 15.12.2003 | US12944898 | 04.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004114567 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US70186503 | 05.11.2003 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7388742 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2008 | B2 | US2004093363 | 13.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US98498092 | 30.11.1992 | US33933089 | 14.04.1989 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US92148597 | 02.09.1997 | US28932294 | 11.08.1994 | US92144992 | 28.07.1992 | US69135203 | 22.10.2003 | US64640596 | 07.05.1996 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US70795491 | 22.05.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7366151 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2008 | B2 | US2004090952 | 13.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US74815091 | 21.08.1991 | US68259103 | 09.10.2003 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | US73512891 | 22.07.1991 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US9405037 | 06.05.1994 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US26775894 | 05.07.1994 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004090945 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50097796 | 04.04.1996 | US95943297 | 28.10.1997 | US69295903 | 24.10.2003 | US10143602 | 19.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004077353 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68474703 | 14.10.2003 | US97319500 | 06.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7676198 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2010 | B2 | US2004077352 | 22.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9609474 | 03.06.1996 | US68465003 | 14.10.2003 | US97319500 | 06.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7826818 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2010 | B2 | US2004073933 | 15.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US94710292 | 14.09.1992 | US65778503 | 08.09.2003 | US9203982 | 13.05.1992 | US90792792 | 30.06.1992 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US31866899 | 25.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7885242 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2011 | B2 | US2004044667 | 04.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US23262894 | 25.04.1994 | US49932895 | 07.07.1995 | US65359703 | 02.09.2003 | US12387598 | 28.07.1998 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7013138 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2006 | B2 | US2004042421 | 04.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69608696 | 13.08.1996 | US9609474 | 03.06.1996 | US19739294 | 16.02.1994 | US23818094 | 04.05.1994 | US77289596 | 24.12.1996 | US87835797 | 27.06.1997 | US64872603 | 26.08.2003 | US17012193 | 20.12.1993 | US35742999 | 20.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7471651 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2008 | B2 | US2004038717 | 26.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US49932895 | 07.07.1995 | US9405037 | 06.05.1994 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US23926794 | 06.05.1994 | US65118803 | 28.08.2003 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7107052 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2006 | B2 | US2004038647 | 26.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69608696 | 13.08.1996 | US9609474 | 03.06.1996 | US19739294 | 16.02.1994 | US23818094 | 04.05.1994 | US77289596 | 24.12.1996 | US64870703 | 26.08.2003 | US87835797 | 27.06.1997 | US17012193 | 20.12.1993 | US35742999 | 20.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7536167 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2009 | B2 | US2004023651 | 05.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US94710292 | 14.09.1992 | US63013803 | 29.07.2003 | US9203982 | 13.05.1992 | US90792792 | 30.06.1992 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US31866899 | 25.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7457646 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2008 | B2 | US2004023617 | 05.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US94710292 | 14.09.1992 | US90792792 | 30.06.1992 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US39555595 | 28.02.1995 | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US9203982 | 13.05.1992 | US6028798 | 14.04.1998 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | US12387302 | 16.04.2002 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | US63107103 | 31.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7383038 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2008 | B2 | US2004018851 | 29.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US62224103 | 18.07.2003 | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US89890892 | 12.06.1992 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US7155593 | 04.06.1993 | US83571892 | 12.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7080788 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2006 | B2 | US2004017824 | 29.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US95534597 | 21.10.1997 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US33933089 | 14.04.1989 | US59791700 | 19.06.2000 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US83571892 | 12.02.1992 | US62261703 | 18.07.2003 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US48128100 | 10.01.2000 | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US89890892 | 12.06.1992 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US7155593 | 04.06.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003193905 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50097796 | 04.04.1996 | US98229292 | 27.11.1992 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US95943297 | 28.10.1997 | US45859703 | 10.06.2003 | US10143602 | 19.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7606287 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2009 | B2 | US2003174764 | 18.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27010794 | 30.06.1994 | US36059103 | 06.02.2003 | US79934001 | 05.03.2001 | EP89114386 | 03.08.1989 | US47655095 | 06.06.1995 | US12387698 | 28.07.1998 | US97323792 | 09.11.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11711564 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2023 | B2 | US2021400328 | 23.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916718927 | 18.12.2019 | US202117222520 | 05.04.2021 | US201815873561 | 17.01.2018 | US70189503 | 05.11.2003 | US201514819718 | 06.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10999618 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2021 | B2 | US2020374576 | 26.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916718927 | 18.12.2019 | US201815873561 | 17.01.2018 | US70189503 | 05.11.2003 | US201514819718 | 06.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10547889 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2020 | B2 | US2018338173 | 22.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815873561 | 17.01.2018 | US70189503 | 05.11.2003 | US201514819718 | 06.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1687969 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2009 | A4 | EP1687969 | 09.08.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70189503 | 05.11.2003 | WO2004US34614 | 19.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1585269 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2015 | B1 | EP1585269 | 28.03.2012 | A3 | EP1585269 | 12.10.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | EP94905966 | 23.12.1993 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1378815 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2012 | B1 | EP1378815 | 31.10.2007 | A3 | EP1378815 | 07.01.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP96116280 | 24.07.1991 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | EP91914315 | 24.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1246404 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2006 | B1 | EP1246404 | 16.10.2002 | A3 | EP1246404 | 02.10.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | EP92922425 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0752763 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2003 | B1 | EP0752763 | 26.02.1997 | A3 | EP0752763 | 08.01.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | EP91914315 | 24.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0740873 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2005 | B1 | EP0740873 | 30.01.2002 | A4 | EP0740873 | 06.11.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | US9412742 | 04.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0716786 | Global Dossier | 06.05.1998 | A4 | EP0716786 | 19.06.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US18156494 | 13.01.1994 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US9404977 | 28.04.1994 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0686279 | Global Dossier | 26.03.1997 | A4 | EP0686279 | 13.12.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | US9402091 | 28.02.1994 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0681762 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2006 | B1 | EP0681762 | 01.03.2000 | A4 | EP0681762 | 15.11.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0667019 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2003 | B1 | EP0667019 | 16.08.1995 | A1 | EP0667019 | 23.06.1992 | A4 | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0645030 | Global Dossier | 10.04.1996 | A4 | EP0645030 | 29.03.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9305648 | 14.06.1993 | US89890892 | 12.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0609227 | Global Dossier | 10.08.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88109692 | 11.05.1992 | US82007092 | 10.01.1992 | US77769191 | 10.10.1991 | US73561091 | 23.07.1991 | US78680291 | 05.11.1991 | US9206156 | 23.07.1992 | US91369392 | 14.07.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0606396 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2002 | B1 | EP0606396 | 17.05.1995 | A4 | EP0606396 | 20.07.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0573567 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2000 | B1 | EP0573567 | 23.03.1994 | A4 | EP0573567 | 15.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US9201461 | 25.02.1992 | US83571892 | 12.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0511295 | Global Dossier | 09.06.1993 | A4 | EP0511295 | 04.11.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0494298 | Global Dossier | 04.06.1997 | B1 | EP0494298 | 15.07.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9105234 | 24.07.1991 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0353759 | Global Dossier | 29.05.1991 | A3 | EP0353759 | 07.02.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22835588 | 04.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2544941 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2018 | C | CA2544941 | 26.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70189503 | 05.11.2003 | WO2004US34614 | 19.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9160291 | Global Dossier | 08.07.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7315498 | Global Dossier | 27.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | AU6272794 | 28.02.1994 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU715628B | Global Dossier | 03.02.2000 | B2 | AU9815198 | 04.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | AU3145895 | 21.07.1995 | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6987694 | Global Dossier | 12.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US8566293 | 29.06.1993 | US6245793 | 11.05.1993 | US19840494 | 22.02.1994 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US19845294 | 18.02.1994 | US9405037 | 06.05.1994 | US7634093 | 11.06.1993 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6825694 | Global Dossier | 21.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US9404977 | 28.04.1994 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6476296 | Global Dossier | 18.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US45769795 | 01.06.1995 | US9609474 | 03.06.1996 | US54481595 | 18.10.1995 | US51365895 | 11.08.1995 | US64534896 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU641541B | Global Dossier | 23.09.1993 | B2 | AU8326291 | 18.02.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU694418B | Global Dossier | 23.07.1998 | B2 | AU6272794 | 14.09.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | US9402091 | 28.02.1994 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU696841B | Global Dossier | 17.09.1998 | B2 | AU5986994 | 19.07.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU654109B | Global Dossier | 27.10.1994 | B2 | AU5856390 | 08.01.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5590294 | Global Dossier | 24.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US97323792 | 09.11.1992 | US9310528 | 02.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4534993 | Global Dossier | 04.01.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US9305648 | 14.06.1993 | US89890892 | 12.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU701114B | Global Dossier | 21.01.1999 | B2 | AU4073795 | 04.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | AU4073795 | 29.12.1995 | AU2800992 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU632055B | Global Dossier | 17.12.1992 | B2 | AU3927889 | 08.02.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US22835588 | 04.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU700800B | Global Dossier | 14.01.1999 | B2 | AU3145895 | 22.02.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US9509380 | 21.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU664864B | Global Dossier | 07.12.1995 | B2 | AU2800992 | 03.05.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU678135B | Global Dossier | 22.05.1997 | B2 | AU1455792 | 15.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US9201461 | 25.02.1992 | US83571892 | 12.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1374795 | Global Dossier | 10.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US19739294 | 16.02.1994 | US9414682 | 20.12.1994 | US23818094 | 04.05.1994 | US17012193 | 20.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU679593B | Global Dossier | 03.07.1997 | B2 | AU1089595 | 23.05.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | US9412742 | 04.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0784893 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2005 | B1 | EP0784893 | 08.11.2000 | A4 | EP0784893 | 23.07.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US9509380 | 21.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE154181T | 15.06.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE193135T | 15.06.2000 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US9201461 | 25.02.1992 | US83571892 | 12.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE219310T | 15.06.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE250247T | 15.10.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE250299T | 15.10.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE298159T | 15.07.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US9509380 | 21.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE321387T | 15.04.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE343263T | 15.11.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE1002234 | 30.10.1990 | A4 | Priority number | Date | US22719588 | 02.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1316218 | 13.04.1993 | C | Priority number | Date | US22835588 | 04.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1338049 | 13.02.1996 | C | Priority number | Date | US22719588 | 02.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1339028 | 01.04.1997 | C | Priority number | Date | US22719588 | 02.08.1988 | CA605040 | 07.07.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1340400 | 16.02.1999 | C | Priority number | Date | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1340450 | 16.03.1999 | C | Priority number | Date | US33933089 | 14.04.1989 | US34677189 | 02.05.1989 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US40083389 | 30.08.1989 | US32766089 | 23.03.1989 | US34729889 | 02.05.1989 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US34784989 | 03.05.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1340933 | 21.03.2000 | C | Priority number | Date | US33933089 | 14.04.1989 | US34677189 | 02.05.1989 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US32766089 | 23.03.1989 | US34729889 | 02.05.1989 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2018154 | 08.12.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2020357 | 08.12.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2022976 | 08.12.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2066587 | 06.02.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9105234 | 24.07.1991 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2074169 | 19.07.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2104788 | 26.08.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US83571892 | 12.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2113713 | 04.02.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88109692 | 11.05.1992 | US82007092 | 10.01.1992 | US77769191 | 10.10.1991 | US73561091 | 23.07.1991 | US78680291 | 05.11.1991 | US91369392 | 14.07.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2120520 | 15.04.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2134907 | 03.05.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14688293 | 02.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2137831 | 23.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89890892 | 12.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2148381 | 11.05.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US97323792 | 09.11.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2152598 | 24.05.2005 | C | CA2152598 | 07.07.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2157039 | 01.09.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2158494 | 17.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48840695 | 07.06.1995 | US48566695 | 07.06.1995 | US40790795 | 21.03.1995 | US49959395 | 07.07.1995 | US32611494 | 19.10.1994 | US31677694 | 03.10.1994 | US30795094 | 16.09.1994 | US38983095 | 16.02.1995 | US30900394 | 19.09.1994 | US37968495 | 25.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2158589 | 19.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48840695 | 07.06.1995 | US48566695 | 07.06.1995 | US40790795 | 21.03.1995 | US49959395 | 07.07.1995 | US32611494 | 19.10.1994 | US31677694 | 03.10.1994 | US38983095 | 16.02.1995 | US30900394 | 19.09.1994 | US37968495 | 25.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2158590 | 20.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48840695 | 07.06.1995 | US48566695 | 07.06.1995 | US40790795 | 21.03.1995 | US49959395 | 07.07.1995 | US32611494 | 19.10.1994 | US31677694 | 03.10.1994 | US38983095 | 16.02.1995 | US30900394 | 19.09.1994 | US37968495 | 25.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2161675 | 10.11.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2162722 | 24.11.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8566293 | 29.06.1993 | US6245793 | 11.05.1993 | US7634093 | 11.06.1993 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2175700 | 11.05.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2179580 | 21.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34895 | 20.06.1995 | US469995 | 03.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2184811 | 08.09.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2215805 | 05.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45769795 | 01.06.1995 | US54481595 | 18.10.1995 | US51365895 | 11.08.1995 | US64534896 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2476866 | 07.07.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | CA2152598 | 23.12.1993 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69034101T | 09.06.2005 | T2 | DE69034101D1 | 23.10.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69126417T | 05.02.1998 | T2 | DE69126417D1 | 10.07.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9105234 | 24.07.1991 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69133312T | 24.06.2004 | T2 | DE69133312D1 | 23.10.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69231057T | 15.02.2001 | T2 | DE69231057D1 | 21.06.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US9201461 | 25.02.1992 | US83571892 | 12.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69232639T | 20.02.2003 | T2 | DE69232639D1 | 18.07.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69233608T | 01.03.2007 | T2 | DE69233608D1 | 11.05.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69334077T | 10.05.2007 | T2 | DE69334077D1 | 30.11.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69434586T | 09.11.2006 | T2 | DE69434586D1 | 26.01.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | US9412742 | 04.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69534281T | 11.05.2006 | T2 | DE69534281D1 | 21.07.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US9509380 | 21.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0667019T | 26.01.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2014740 | 16.07.1990 | A6 | Priority number | Date | US22719588 | 02.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2104716T | 16.10.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2210223T | 01.07.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2221426 | 17.02.1993 | B | GB2221426 | 07.02.1990 | A | GB8915598D0 | 23.08.1989 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US22719588 | 02.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2223914 | 18.11.1992 | B | GB2223914 | 18.04.1990 | A | GB8917800D0 | 20.09.1989 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US22835588 | 04.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1230308 | 18.10.1991 | B | Priority number | Date | US22719588 | 02.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LU87552 | 26.10.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22719588 | 02.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2001050943 | 13.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27010794 | 30.06.1994 | US79934001 | 05.03.2001 | EP89114386 | 03.08.1989 | US47655095 | 06.06.1995 | US12387698 | 28.07.1998 | US97323792 | 09.11.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6910632 | 28.06.2005 | B2 | US2002162892 | 07.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60907800 | 30.06.2000 | US18818302 | 02.07.2002 | US27755994 | 19.07.1994 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US73517496 | 22.10.1996 | US7155593 | 04.06.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6850510 | 01.02.2005 | B2 | US2003002482 | 02.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US14150602 | 08.05.2002 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6895450 | 17.05.2005 | B2 | US2003051080 | 13.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US94710292 | 14.09.1992 | US90792792 | 30.06.1992 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US39555595 | 28.02.1995 | US31866899 | 25.05.1999 | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US9203982 | 13.05.1992 | US6028798 | 14.04.1998 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | US12387302 | 16.04.2002 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7606575 | 20.10.2009 | B2 | US2003078006 | 24.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38972789 | 04.08.1989 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US70795491 | 22.05.1991 | US88385492 | 13.05.1992 | US93445701 | 21.08.2001 | US5781602 | 24.01.2002 | US27010794 | 30.06.1994 | US82696092 | 24.01.1992 | US55144295 | 01.11.1995 | EP89114386 | 03.08.1989 | US12387698 | 28.07.1998 | US97323792 | 09.11.1992 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US79934001 | 05.03.2001 | US22835588 | 04.08.1988 | US91086592 | 06.07.1992 | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US48531390 | 26.02.1990 | US80097791 | 02.12.1991 | US76501391 | 24.09.1991 | US47655095 | 06.06.1995 | US86430092 | 06.04.1992 | US72725691 | 09.07.1991 | US98094792 | 26.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7120319 | 10.10.2006 | B2 | US2003081860 | 01.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18977898 | 10.11.1998 | US21511594 | 17.03.1994 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US79032897 | 28.01.1997 | US8546802 | 28.02.2002 | US27509694 | 14.07.1994 | US41516989 | 29.09.1989 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US77739392 | 07.01.1992 | US13577198 | 18.08.1998 | US43822095 | 09.05.1995 | US36001494 | 20.12.1994 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US67475691 | 25.03.1991 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US98757492 | 08.12.1992 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US30607394 | 14.09.1994 | US85248092 | 17.03.1992 | US71784100 | 21.11.2000 | US89754786 | 15.08.1986 | US47848895 | 07.06.1995 | US4031393 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6990090 | 24.01.2006 | B2 | US2003091014 | 15.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US16222902 | 04.06.2002 | US7279198 | 05.05.1998 | US49490995 | 26.06.1995 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US53188000 | 21.03.2000 | US78012496 | 26.12.1996 | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US8995098 | 03.06.1998 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | US5890593 | 06.05.1993 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | US7314293 | 04.06.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7907577 | 15.03.2011 | B2 | US2003112767 | 19.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48219700 | 12.01.2000 | US7279198 | 05.05.1998 | US27053394 | 05.07.1994 | US49490995 | 26.06.1995 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US84977601 | 04.05.2001 | US39555595 | 28.02.1995 | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US8995098 | 03.06.1998 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US14425002 | 13.05.2002 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US6028798 | 14.04.1998 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | US94149697 | 30.09.1997 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US53188000 | 21.03.2000 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US78012496 | 26.12.1996 | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | US96026501 | 21.09.2001 | US5890593 | 06.05.1993 | US7314293 | 04.06.1993 | US12387302 | 16.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003128685 | 10.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50097796 | 04.04.1996 | US98229292 | 27.11.1992 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US95943297 | 28.10.1997 | US10143602 | 19.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4877949 | 31.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4882476 | 21.11.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US90577986 | 10.09.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4910794 | 20.03.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US22835588 | 04.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5019699 | 28.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US23870188 | 31.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5023823 | 11.06.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US92891686 | 07.11.1986 | US21243588 | 28.06.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5031098 | 09.07.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US34514689 | 28.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5052020 | 24.09.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5052943 | 01.10.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US32766089 | 23.03.1989 | US55166390 | 10.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5070536 | 03.12.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US22835588 | 04.08.1988 | US38972789 | 04.08.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5123064 | 16.06.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US41516989 | 29.09.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5180232 | 19.01.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US54929890 | 05.07.1990 | US22719588 | 02.08.1988 | US34677189 | 02.05.1989 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US21686888 | 08.07.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5195183 | 16.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US78474891 | 28.10.1991 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US34784989 | 03.05.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5202817 | 13.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5202825 | 13.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US34514689 | 28.04.1989 | US72702191 | 08.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5218187 | 08.06.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5218188 | 08.06.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US42613589 | 24.10.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5227614 | 13.07.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US89754786 | 15.08.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5289378 | 22.02.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US2489293 | 01.03.1993 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5295154 | 15.03.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5305181 | 19.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US81670592 | 02.01.1992 | US67475691 | 25.03.1991 | US36490489 | 15.05.1989 | US87271792 | 23.04.1992 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US81276791 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5308966 | 03.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5313053 | 17.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US67475691 | 25.03.1991 | US98757492 | 08.12.1992 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5317691 | 31.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US40083389 | 30.08.1989 | US34729889 | 02.05.1989 | US92140892 | 31.07.1992 | US75980791 | 16.09.1991 | US34784989 | 03.05.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5322991 | 21.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US42613589 | 24.10.1989 | US2257793 | 23.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5331136 | 19.07.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US7155593 | 04.06.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5331580 | 19.07.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US94803492 | 21.09.1992 | US4604893 | 12.04.1993 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5349497 | 20.09.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US81670592 | 02.01.1992 | US95026192 | 23.09.1992 | US92284392 | 31.07.1992 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US87762592 | 01.05.1992 | US95673092 | 05.10.1992 | US81276791 | 23.12.1991 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5349678 | 20.09.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US74815091 | 21.08.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5359185 | 25.10.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US88109692 | 11.05.1992 | US94517492 | 14.09.1992 | US91369392 | 14.07.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5365546 | 15.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US73512891 | 22.07.1991 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5371858 | 06.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US78474891 | 28.10.1991 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US34784989 | 03.05.1989 | US92287992 | 31.07.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5394436 | 28.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5408382 | 18.04.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US27588494 | 15.07.1994 | US81876192 | 10.01.1992 | US95887392 | 08.10.1992 | US88045292 | 08.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5410141 | 25.04.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US77739392 | 07.01.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5418684 | 23.05.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US19252594 | 04.02.1994 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US1704993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5425051 | 13.06.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US27010794 | 30.06.1994 | US97323792 | 09.11.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5428636 | 27.06.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5457629 | 10.10.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US94782092 | 18.09.1992 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5465207 | 07.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US94768792 | 21.09.1992 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5466170 | 14.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US14688293 | 02.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5468947 | 21.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US89754786 | 15.08.1986 | US4031393 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5468950 | 21.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US88109692 | 11.05.1992 | US94517492 | 14.09.1992 | US28188494 | 28.07.1994 | US91369392 | 14.07.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5483676 | 09.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US80097791 | 02.12.1991 | US19114894 | 02.02.1994 | US38972789 | 04.08.1989 | US22835588 | 04.08.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5488575 | 30.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US94803492 | 21.09.1992 | US72866791 | 11.07.1991 | US34677189 | 02.05.1989 | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US22651694 | 12.04.1994 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5504746 | 02.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US41059295 | 27.03.1995 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5515303 | 07.05.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US98498092 | 30.11.1992 | US33933089 | 14.04.1989 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US28932294 | 11.08.1994 | US92144992 | 28.07.1992 | US70795491 | 22.05.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5517434 | 14.05.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US33933089 | 14.04.1989 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US92144992 | 28.07.1992 | US90913992 | 06.07.1992 | US70795491 | 22.05.1991 | US56199490 | 31.07.1990 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US17139093 | 21.12.1993 | US98498092 | 30.11.1992 | US5070493 | 21.04.1993 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US34784989 | 03.05.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5521370 | 28.05.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US5070493 | 21.04.1993 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US39089295 | 14.02.1995 | US90913992 | 06.07.1992 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5530619 | 25.06.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US38277795 | 31.01.1995 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US19252594 | 04.02.1994 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US1704993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5539193 | 23.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US87732492 | 01.05.1992 | US81688892 | 03.01.1992 | US86664292 | 03.04.1992 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US80938091 | 18.12.1991 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US77739392 | 07.01.1992 | US25184494 | 31.05.1994 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5539194 | 23.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US87732492 | 01.05.1992 | US81688892 | 03.01.1992 | US86664292 | 03.04.1992 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US44461995 | 19.05.1995 | US80938091 | 18.12.1991 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US77739392 | 07.01.1992 | US25184494 | 31.05.1994 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5541398 | 30.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US24959594 | 26.05.1994 | US43845895 | 10.05.1995 | US42613589 | 24.10.1989 | US2257793 | 23.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5544010 | 06.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US27588494 | 15.07.1994 | US81876192 | 10.01.1992 | US95887392 | 08.10.1992 | US42323995 | 17.04.1995 | US88045292 | 08.05.1992 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5546397 | 13.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US19739294 | 16.02.1994 | US23818094 | 04.05.1994 | US17012193 | 20.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5555276 | 10.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US73512891 | 22.07.1991 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5567925 | 22.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US27755994 | 19.07.1994 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US7155593 | 04.06.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5568645 | 22.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US74815091 | 21.08.1991 | US26775894 | 05.07.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5576529 | 19.11.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | US30933494 | 19.09.1994 | US21511294 | 17.03.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5587577 | 24.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US81670592 | 02.01.1992 | US87271792 | 23.04.1992 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US19515494 | 10.02.1994 | US81276791 | 23.12.1991 | US44963095 | 24.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5590346 | 31.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5598487 | 28.01.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US27509694 | 14.07.1994 | US41516989 | 29.09.1989 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US30607394 | 14.09.1994 | US85248092 | 17.03.1992 | US89754786 | 15.08.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5602456 | 11.02.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US98498092 | 30.11.1992 | US33933089 | 14.04.1989 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US28932294 | 11.08.1994 | US92144992 | 28.07.1992 | US77739392 | 07.01.1992 | US48988795 | 13.06.1995 | US70795491 | 22.05.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5602854 | 11.02.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US98229292 | 27.11.1992 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5617343 | 01.04.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US94803492 | 21.09.1992 | US72866791 | 11.07.1991 | US34677189 | 02.05.1989 | US57397495 | 18.12.1995 | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US22651694 | 12.04.1994 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5625180 | 29.04.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US38753095 | 13.02.1995 | US5070493 | 21.04.1993 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US13609787 | 21.12.1987 | US90913992 | 06.07.1992 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5625555 | 29.04.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US94803492 | 21.09.1992 | US2530893 | 02.03.1993 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US42338595 | 14.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5640001 | 17.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | US21511294 | 17.03.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5644471 | 01.07.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US27588494 | 15.07.1994 | US81876192 | 10.01.1992 | US95887392 | 08.10.1992 | US42323995 | 17.04.1995 | US64598096 | 14.05.1996 | US88045292 | 08.05.1992 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5657317 | 12.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US98229292 | 27.11.1992 | US19840494 | 22.02.1994 | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US19845294 | 18.02.1994 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US8566293 | 29.06.1993 | US73512891 | 22.07.1991 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US6245793 | 11.05.1993 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US7634093 | 11.06.1993 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5671436 | 23.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US74815091 | 21.08.1991 | US26775894 | 05.07.1994 | US52013695 | 28.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5672860 | 30.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US60005390 | 17.10.1990 | US25743394 | 08.06.1994 | US37174795 | 12.01.1995 | US13609787 | 21.12.1987 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US83205292 | 06.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5673031 | 30.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US27053394 | 05.07.1994 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US38972789 | 04.08.1989 | US22835588 | 04.08.1988 | US91086592 | 06.07.1992 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US70795491 | 22.05.1991 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US88385492 | 13.05.1992 | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US82696092 | 24.01.1992 | US80097791 | 02.12.1991 | US48531390 | 26.02.1990 | US76501391 | 24.09.1991 | US86430092 | 06.04.1992 | US72725691 | 09.07.1991 | US98094792 | 26.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5679943 | 21.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US81688892 | 03.01.1992 | US80938091 | 18.12.1991 | US95704892 | 05.10.1992 | US77739392 | 07.01.1992 | US81276791 | 23.12.1991 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US87886692 | 05.05.1992 | US81670592 | 02.01.1992 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US81876192 | 10.01.1992 | US67475691 | 25.03.1991 | US81876292 | 10.01.1992 | US92716792 | 05.08.1992 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US34514589 | 28.04.1989 | US72702191 | 08.07.1991 | US16391793 | 08.12.1993 | US47190495 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5680633 | 21.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US83571892 | 12.02.1992 | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US89890892 | 12.06.1992 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US7155593 | 04.06.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5682379 | 28.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US50097796 | 04.04.1996 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5694318 | 02.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US94782092 | 18.09.1992 | US92891686 | 07.11.1986 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US48058795 | 07.06.1995 | US91502386 | 03.10.1986 | US21243588 | 28.06.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5696903 | 09.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US23641394 | 29.04.1994 | US8566293 | 29.06.1993 | US6245793 | 11.05.1993 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US19738694 | 16.02.1994 | US7634093 | 11.06.1993 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5708680 | 13.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US5721893 | 04.05.1993 | US48601795 | 07.06.1995 | US27794494 | 29.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5708833 | 13.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5710728 | 20.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US48840695 | 07.06.1995 | US72866791 | 11.07.1991 | US30795094 | 16.09.1994 | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | US22651694 | 12.04.1994 | US38983095 | 16.02.1995 | US30900394 | 19.09.1994 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5726984 | 10.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US74815091 | 21.08.1991 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | US73512891 | 22.07.1991 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US52935390 | 25.05.1990 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US26775894 | 05.07.1994 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5740366 | 14.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US39555595 | 28.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5747785 | 05.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US60005390 | 17.10.1990 | US25743394 | 08.06.1994 | US45321095 | 30.05.1995 | US37174795 | 12.01.1995 | US13609787 | 21.12.1987 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US83205292 | 06.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5747786 | 05.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US46041395 | 02.06.1995 | US98498092 | 30.11.1992 | US33933089 | 14.04.1989 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US28932294 | 11.08.1994 | US92144992 | 28.07.1992 | US77739392 | 07.01.1992 | US70795491 | 22.05.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5748619 | 05.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US27053394 | 05.07.1994 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US78012496 | 26.12.1996 | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | US5890593 | 06.05.1993 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | US7314293 | 04.06.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5790536 | 04.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US19840494 | 22.02.1994 | US34677189 | 02.05.1989 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US8566293 | 29.06.1993 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US7634093 | 11.06.1993 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US98229292 | 27.11.1992 | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US19845294 | 18.02.1994 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US73512891 | 22.07.1991 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US6245793 | 11.05.1993 | US52935390 | 25.05.1990 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US26775894 | 05.07.1994 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5793604 | 11.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US38277795 | 31.01.1995 | US19252594 | 04.02.1994 | US67035596 | 25.06.1996 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US1704993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5804805 | 08.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | US75138196 | 19.11.1996 | US30933494 | 19.09.1994 | US21511294 | 17.03.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5805474 | 08.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US19252594 | 04.02.1994 | US38983095 | 16.02.1995 | US30900394 | 19.09.1994 | US77739392 | 07.01.1992 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US9402091 | 28.02.1994 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US72866791 | 11.07.1991 | US30795094 | 16.09.1994 | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US22651694 | 12.04.1994 | US1704993 | 12.02.1993 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5805807 | 08.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US52935390 | 25.05.1990 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US44823795 | 23.05.1995 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5834753 | 10.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US91291792 | 13.07.1992 | US21511594 | 17.03.1994 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US43822095 | 09.05.1995 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US82007092 | 10.01.1992 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US73561091 | 23.07.1991 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US90577986 | 10.09.1986 | US89754786 | 15.08.1986 | US44100789 | 21.11.1989 | US71973191 | 24.06.1991 | US42613589 | 24.10.1989 | US96598392 | 23.10.1992 | US77739391 | 06.12.1991 | US78680291 | 05.11.1991 | US56199490 | 31.07.1990 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US88109692 | 11.05.1992 | US67475691 | 25.03.1991 | US98757492 | 08.12.1992 | US77769191 | 10.10.1991 | US96052092 | 13.10.1992 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US34784989 | 03.05.1989 | US4031393 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5837987 | 17.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | US75138296 | 19.11.1996 | US30933494 | 19.09.1994 | US21511294 | 17.03.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5841121 | 24.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US23870188 | 31.08.1988 | US97282292 | 06.11.1992 | US30933494 | 19.09.1994 | US61660290 | 21.11.1990 | US75237096 | 19.11.1996 | US21511294 | 17.03.1994 | US34526894 | 28.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5844893 | 01.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US5721893 | 04.05.1993 | US48608395 | 07.06.1995 | US27794494 | 29.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5850358 | 15.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US94803492 | 21.09.1992 | US72866791 | 11.07.1991 | US57397495 | 18.12.1995 | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US22651694 | 12.04.1994 | US83103597 | 01.04.1997 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5862171 | 19.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US27010794 | 30.06.1994 | US47655095 | 06.06.1995 | US97323792 | 09.11.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5870279 | 09.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US77539196 | 31.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5872354 | 16.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US91291792 | 13.07.1992 | US71973191 | 24.06.1991 | US34677189 | 02.05.1989 | US42613589 | 24.10.1989 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US32829090 | 19.06.1990 | US34327294 | 22.11.1994 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US78680291 | 05.11.1991 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US56199490 | 31.07.1990 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US88109692 | 11.05.1992 | US67475691 | 25.03.1991 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US77769191 | 10.10.1991 | US34729889 | 02.05.1989 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US96052092 | 13.10.1992 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US34784989 | 03.05.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5888087 | 30.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US17139093 | 21.12.1993 | US64747796 | 14.05.1996 | US5070493 | 21.04.1993 | US55776295 | 13.11.1995 | US14688293 | 02.11.1993 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US77253896 | 24.12.1996 | US90913992 | 06.07.1992 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US56199490 | 31.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5892971 | 06.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US44816995 | 23.05.1995 | US89754786 | 15.08.1986 | US4031393 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5895431 | 20.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US94782092 | 18.09.1992 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US98433797 | 02.12.1997 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US48058795 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5895906 | 20.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US45247595 | 26.05.1995 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US89754786 | 15.08.1986 | US4031393 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5896561 | 20.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US44876995 | 24.05.1995 | US11927893 | 09.09.1993 | US77347796 | 23.12.1996 | US86430092 | 06.04.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5898162 | 27.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US38277795 | 31.01.1995 | US19252594 | 04.02.1994 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US46333495 | 05.06.1995 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US1704993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5912926 | 15.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US73512891 | 22.07.1991 | US71152496 | 10.09.1996 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5914481 | 22.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US91291792 | 13.07.1992 | US21511594 | 17.03.1994 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US44186495 | 16.05.1995 | US82007092 | 10.01.1992 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US73561091 | 23.07.1991 | US46617595 | 06.06.1995 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US90577986 | 10.09.1986 | US89754786 | 15.08.1986 | US94604897 | 07.10.1997 | US44100789 | 21.11.1989 | US71973191 | 24.06.1991 | US42613589 | 24.10.1989 | US96598392 | 23.10.1992 | US77739391 | 06.12.1991 | US78680291 | 05.11.1991 | US80579097 | 25.02.1997 | US56199490 | 31.07.1990 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US88109692 | 11.05.1992 | US67475691 | 25.03.1991 | US98757492 | 08.12.1992 | US77769191 | 10.10.1991 | US96052092 | 13.10.1992 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US34784989 | 03.05.1989 | US4031393 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5917175 | 29.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US81688892 | 03.01.1992 | US86664292 | 03.04.1992 | US68525496 | 23.07.1996 | US44461995 | 19.05.1995 | US80938091 | 18.12.1991 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US25184494 | 31.05.1994 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5928292 | 27.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US98275097 | 02.12.1997 | US94782092 | 18.09.1992 | US92891686 | 07.11.1986 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US48058795 | 07.06.1995 | US91502386 | 03.10.1986 | US21243588 | 28.06.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5940771 | 17.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US94710292 | 14.09.1992 | US90792792 | 30.06.1992 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5949056 | 07.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US91291792 | 13.07.1992 | US21511594 | 17.03.1994 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US82007092 | 10.01.1992 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US73561091 | 23.07.1991 | US34760289 | 03.05.1989 | US90577986 | 10.09.1986 | US44100789 | 21.11.1989 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US71973191 | 24.06.1991 | US42613589 | 24.10.1989 | US56199195 | 22.11.1995 | US96598392 | 23.10.1992 | US78680291 | 05.11.1991 | US56199490 | 31.07.1990 | US88109692 | 11.05.1992 | US67475691 | 25.03.1991 | US98757492 | 08.12.1992 | US77769191 | 10.10.1991 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US96052092 | 13.10.1992 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US34784989 | 03.05.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5949776 | 07.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US98229292 | 27.11.1992 | US19840494 | 22.02.1994 | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US19845294 | 18.02.1994 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US90992797 | 12.08.1997 | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US8566293 | 29.06.1993 | US73512891 | 22.07.1991 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US6245793 | 11.05.1993 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US7634093 | 11.06.1993 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5960344 | 28.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US69608696 | 13.08.1996 | US19739294 | 16.02.1994 | US23818094 | 04.05.1994 | US87835797 | 27.06.1997 | US17012193 | 20.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5969321 | 19.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US87724397 | 17.06.1997 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | US21511294 | 17.03.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5978569 | 02.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US40083389 | 30.08.1989 | US73961696 | 30.10.1996 | US34729889 | 02.05.1989 | US92140892 | 31.07.1992 | US75980791 | 16.09.1991 | US34784989 | 03.05.1989 | US25082794 | 31.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5979768 | 09.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US47622695 | 07.06.1995 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US23870188 | 31.08.1988 | US97282292 | 06.11.1992 | US61660290 | 21.11.1990 | US34526894 | 28.11.1994 | US36001494 | 20.12.1994 | US4031393 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5987499 | 16.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US74815091 | 21.08.1991 | US26775894 | 05.07.1994 | US73535196 | 22.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5991864 | 23.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US18156494 | 13.01.1994 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US22617794 | 12.04.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6006100 | 21.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US52935390 | 25.05.1990 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US23926794 | 06.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6014705 | 11.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US95534597 | 21.10.1997 | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US89890892 | 12.06.1992 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | US7155593 | 04.06.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6023147 | 08.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US33933089 | 14.04.1989 | US19252594 | 04.02.1994 | US28932294 | 11.08.1994 | US92144992 | 28.07.1992 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US48988795 | 13.06.1995 | US70795491 | 22.05.1991 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US98498092 | 30.11.1992 | US38277795 | 31.01.1995 | US70241096 | 14.08.1996 | US67035596 | 25.06.1996 | US1704993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6036093 | 14.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US87271792 | 23.04.1992 | US77253796 | 24.12.1996 | US19515494 | 10.02.1994 | US8147198 | 19.05.1998 | US44963095 | 24.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6046992 | 04.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US41059295 | 27.03.1995 | US6612598 | 24.04.1998 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | US54383896 | 16.02.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6049813 | 11.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US76077496 | 05.12.1996 | US58469896 | 08.01.1996 | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | US30900394 | 19.09.1994 | US9402091 | 28.02.1994 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6058000 | 02.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US17139093 | 21.12.1993 | US35377894 | 12.12.1994 | US41966495 | 12.04.1995 | US56199490 | 31.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6084867 | 04.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US8995098 | 03.06.1998 | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US5682793 | 03.05.1993 | US49490995 | 26.06.1995 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US5890593 | 06.05.1993 | US7314293 | 04.06.1993 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6112206 | 29.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US93574197 | 23.09.1997 | US74815091 | 21.08.1991 | US26775894 | 05.07.1994 | US52013695 | 28.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6138915 | 31.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US42205289 | 16.10.1989 | US19203398 | 13.11.1998 | US94703692 | 16.09.1992 | US87579192 | 27.04.1992 | US89468986 | 08.08.1986 | US75138296 | 19.11.1996 | US30933494 | 19.09.1994 | US21511294 | 17.03.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6144976 | 07.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US72182096 | 27.09.1996 | US40790795 | 21.03.1995 | US452895 | 29.06.1995 | US32611494 | 19.10.1994 | US30900394 | 19.09.1994 | US34895 | 20.06.1995 | US37968495 | 25.01.1995 | US469995 | 03.10.1995 | US31677694 | 03.10.1994 | US30795094 | 16.09.1994 | US66698396 | 20.06.1996 | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | US22651694 | 12.04.1994 | US452195 | 29.09.1995 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6149062 | 21.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US18977898 | 10.11.1998 | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US14392188 | 14.01.1988 | US43822095 | 09.05.1995 | US4031393 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6192400 | 20.02.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US52935390 | 25.05.1990 | US14896298 | 08.09.1998 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US44823795 | 23.05.1995 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6244512 | 12.06.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US38277795 | 31.01.1995 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US19252594 | 04.02.1994 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US13949298 | 25.08.1998 | US46333495 | 05.06.1995 | US77739391 | 06.12.1991 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US1704993 | 12.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6266685 | 24.07.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US72866791 | 11.07.1991 | US30795094 | 16.09.1994 | US4887393 | 16.04.1993 | US22651694 | 12.04.1994 | US38983095 | 16.02.1995 | US30900394 | 19.09.1994 | US14941498 | 08.09.1998 | US9402091 | 28.02.1994 | US2384093 | 26.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6359872 | 19.03.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US95943297 | 28.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6374311 | 16.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US94710292 | 14.09.1992 | US90792792 | 30.06.1992 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US39555595 | 28.02.1995 | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US97041192 | 02.11.1992 | US25584894 | 08.06.1994 | US9203982 | 13.05.1992 | US6028798 | 14.04.1998 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6375344 | 23.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US33933089 | 14.04.1989 | US34520089 | 28.04.1989 | US92144992 | 28.07.1992 | US90913992 | 06.07.1992 | US70795491 | 22.05.1991 | US56199490 | 31.07.1990 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US17139093 | 21.12.1993 | US64747796 | 14.05.1996 | US98498092 | 30.11.1992 | US5070493 | 21.04.1993 | US34729889 | 02.05.1989 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US30530289 | 31.01.1989 | US34784989 | 03.05.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6389010 | 14.05.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US3753598 | 10.03.1998 | US53981795 | 05.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6400702 | 04.06.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US5944793 | 07.05.1993 | US8995098 | 03.06.1998 | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US49490995 | 26.06.1995 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US5890593 | 06.05.1993 | US7314293 | 04.06.1993 | US53188000 | 21.03.2000 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | US85682793 | 03.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6407991 | 18.06.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US17773894 | 04.01.1994 | US23809094 | 04.05.1994 | US7279198 | 05.05.1998 | US31815494 | 04.10.1994 | US5890593 | 06.05.1993 | US7314293 | 04.06.1993 | US14776693 | 04.11.1993 | US78012496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6431451 | 13.08.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US60907800 | 30.06.2000 | US27755994 | 19.07.1994 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US73517496 | 22.10.1996 | US7155593 | 04.06.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6614768 | 02.09.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US23262894 | 25.04.1994 | US34514689 | 28.04.1989 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | US4435193 | 07.04.1993 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US9405037 | 06.05.1994 | US26775894 | 05.07.1994 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US12387598 | 28.07.1998 | US72702191 | 08.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6621942 | 16.09.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US45132289 | 15.12.1989 | US79032897 | 28.01.1997 | US27509694 | 14.07.1994 | US41516989 | 29.09.1989 | US30607394 | 14.09.1994 | US13577198 | 18.08.1998 | US85248092 | 17.03.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6654378 | 25.11.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US49932895 | 07.07.1995 | US9405037 | 06.05.1994 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US23926794 | 06.05.1994 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6665536 | 16.12.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US69608696 | 13.08.1996 | US9609474 | 03.06.1996 | US19739294 | 16.02.1994 | US23818094 | 04.05.1994 | US77289596 | 24.12.1996 | US87835797 | 27.06.1997 | US17012193 | 20.12.1993 | US35742999 | 20.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6681994 | 27.01.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US47622695 | 07.06.1995 | US4168702 | 08.01.2002 | US19809798 | 23.11.1998 | US23870188 | 31.08.1988 | US97282292 | 06.11.1992 | US61660290 | 21.11.1990 | US89240501 | 27.06.2001 | US75237096 | 19.11.1996 | US14916998 | 08.09.1998 | US34526894 | 28.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6688523 | 10.02.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US19809798 | 23.11.1998 | US23870188 | 31.08.1988 | US97282292 | 06.11.1992 | US61660290 | 21.11.1990 | US34526894 | 28.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6694359 | 17.02.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US74815091 | 21.08.1991 | US26775894 | 05.07.1994 | US51992100 | 07.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6697415 | 24.02.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9609474 | 03.06.1996 | US97319500 | 06.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6714559 | 30.03.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US48219700 | 12.01.2000 | US96026501 | 21.09.2001 | US27053394 | 05.07.1994 | US94149697 | 30.09.1997 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US84977601 | 04.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6714983 | 30.03.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US19840494 | 22.02.1994 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US14737793 | 03.11.1993 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US8566293 | 29.06.1993 | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US27582194 | 10.06.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US66061591 | 25.02.1991 | US9405037 | 06.05.1994 | US40152695 | 10.03.1995 | US7634093 | 11.06.1993 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US85411592 | 18.03.1992 | US20563994 | 04.03.1994 | US87677692 | 28.04.1992 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US7155593 | 04.06.1993 | US10125493 | 03.08.1993 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | US2714093 | 05.03.1993 | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US33933089 | 14.04.1989 | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US19845294 | 18.02.1994 | US19738694 | 16.02.1994 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US74815091 | 21.08.1991 | US51365895 | 11.08.1995 | US9312628 | 23.12.1993 | US83571892 | 12.02.1992 | US87662992 | 30.04.1992 | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US73512891 | 22.07.1991 | US16847893 | 16.12.1993 | US6245793 | 11.05.1993 | US43107795 | 27.04.1995 | US89890892 | 12.06.1992 | US46709690 | 18.01.1990 | US99769392 | 23.12.1992 | US26775894 | 05.07.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6749122 | 15.06.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US46725599 | 20.12.1999 | US52935390 | 25.05.1990 | US55889590 | 25.07.1990 | US23926794 | 06.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6792256 | 14.09.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US8141193 | 22.06.1993 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US656698 | 13.01.1998 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6826165 | 30.11.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US96899092 | 30.10.1992 | US76942591 | 01.10.1991 | US41059295 | 27.03.1995 | US54242400 | 04.04.2000 | US6612598 | 24.04.1998 | US54383896 | 16.02.1996 | US9208610 | 01.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6895419 | 17.05.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US36459489 | 07.06.1989 | US62671190 | 12.12.1990 | US98498092 | 30.11.1992 | US9003282 | 07.06.1990 | US92148597 | 02.09.1997 | US36490289 | 08.06.1989 | US28932294 | 11.08.1994 | US92144992 | 28.07.1992 | US64640596 | 07.05.1996 | US63350090 | 26.12.1990 | US70795491 | 22.05.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6928302 | 09.08.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US96019497 | 29.10.1997 | US9746293 | 26.07.1993 | US43107795 | 27.04.1995 | US5390193 | 27.04.1993 | US10747093 | 17.08.1993 | US25828594 | 10.06.1994 | US84141197 | 22.04.1997 | US40152695 | 10.03.1995 | US22625694 | 11.04.1994 | US19417894 | 09.02.1994 | US15402093 | 17.11.1993 | US61999000 | 20.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6970434 | 29.11.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | US12944898 | 04.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7206592 | 17.04.2007 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US69981891 | 13.05.1991 | US91086592 | 06.07.1992 | US70070491 | 14.05.1991 | US93445701 | 21.08.2001 | US5721893 | 04.05.1993 | US82696092 | 24.01.1992 | US48531390 | 26.02.1990 | US76501391 | 24.09.1991 | US55144295 | 01.11.1995 | US27794494 | 29.06.1994 | US97274901 | 08.10.2001 | US72725691 | 09.07.1991 | US98094792 | 26.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7537167 | 26.05.2009 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US11487293 | 31.08.1993 | US95534597 | 21.10.1997 | US48128100 | 10.01.2000 | US59791700 | 19.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7558557 | 07.07.2009 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US85760392 | 30.03.1992 | US79094691 | 12.11.1991 | US94710292 | 14.09.1992 | US9203982 | 13.05.1992 | US90792792 | 30.06.1992 | US54510895 | 19.10.1995 | US80234891 | 04.12.1991 | US31866899 | 25.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7924783 | 12.04.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US9405037 | 06.05.1994 | US72393000 | 28.11.2000 | US12944898 | 04.08.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9603823 | Global Dossier | 08.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2195661 | 08.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27914894 | 22.07.1994 | US48760995 | 07.06.1995 |