EP0784893 - HIERARCHICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEM PROVIDING INTELLIGENT DATA, PROGRAM AND PROCESSING MIGRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Opposition rejected | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alston Parkway Irvine, California 92619 / US | ||
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states NORAND CORPORATION 550 Second Street, S.E. Cedar Rapids, IA 52401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHANY, Ronald, L. 3133 Adirondack Drive, N.E. Cedar Rapids, IA 52402 / US | 02 /
WEST, Guy, J. 114 S. Washington Lisbon, IA 52253 / US | 03 /
BUNTE, Alan, G. 5510 Hickorywood Court Cedar Rapids, IA 52411 / US | 04 /
DANIELSON, Arvin, D. 1560 Bramblewood Solon, IA 52333 / US | 05 /
MORRIS, Michael, D. 335 Trailridge Road S.E. Cedar Rapids, IA 52403 / US | 06 /
MEIER, Robert, C. 407 Sinclair Avenue S.E. Cedar Rapids, IA 52403 / US | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Jehle, Volker Armin Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/29] | Jehle, Volker Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/30] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 95927421.8 | 21.07.1995 | [1997/30] | WO1995US09380 | Priority number, date | US19940279148 | 22.07.1994 Original published format: US 279148 | US19950487609 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 487609 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603823 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0784893 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0784893 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/44, H04L12/54, H04B7/26 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
H04W52/46 (EP,US);
B60R16/0231 (EP,US);
G06F1/1626 (EP,US);
G06F1/163 (EP,US);
G06F1/1632 (EP,US);
G06F1/28 (EP,US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F15/0225 (EP,US);
G06K17/0022 (EP,US);
G06K7/10574 (EP,US);
G06K7/10584 (EP,US);
G06K7/10702 (EP,US);
G06K7/10722 (EP,US);
G06K7/10732 (EP,US);
G06K7/10811 (EP,US);
G06K7/10841 (EP,US);
G06K7/10851 (EP,US);
G06K7/10881 (EP,US);
G06K7/1098 (EP,US);
G06K7/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/343 (EP,US);
G07C5/0808 (EP,US);
G07C5/0858 (EP,US);
G07C9/27 (EP,US);
G07C9/38 (EP,US);
G07F7/02 (EP,US);
G07G1/0045 (EP,US);
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
H04B1/3877 (EP,US);
H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/0032 (EP,US);
H04L1/1671 (EP,US);
H04L1/1685 (EP,US);
H04L27/12 (EP,US);
H04L27/156 (EP,US);
H04L45/48 (EP,US);
H04L61/00 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
H04W52/343 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
B60R16/0315 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1632 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1633 (EP,US);
G08C2201/20 (EP,US);
H04B1/1615 (EP,US);
H04B17/0085 (EP,US);
H04B17/318 (EP,US);
H04B2001/3894 (EP,US);
H04L12/403 (EP,US);
H04L69/18 (EP,US);
H04L69/32 (US);
H04L69/325 (EP);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (EP,US);
H04W28/14 (EP,US);
H04W52/029 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/30] | Title | German: | HIERARCHISCHES KOMMUNIKAITONSSYSTEM MIT INTELLIGENTER MIGRATION VON DATEN, PROGRAMMEN UND VERARBEITUNG | [2004/52] | English: | HIERARCHICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEM PROVIDING INTELLIGENT DATA, PROGRAM AND PROCESSING MIGRATION | [1997/30] | French: | SYSTEME HIERARCHIQUE DE COMMUNICATIONS PERMETTANT LA MIGRATION INTELLIGENTE DE DONNEES, DE PROGRAMMES ET DE TRAITEMENTS | [2005/02] |
Former [1997/30] | HIERARCHISCHES KOMMUNIKAITONSSYSTEM MIT MIGRATION VON INTELLIGENTEN DATEN, PROGRAMMEN UND VERARBEITUNG | ||
Former [1997/30] | SYSTEME HIERARCHISE DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS A MIGRATION INTELLIGENTE DES DONNEES, DES PROGRAMMES ET DES TRAITEMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 24.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 26.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US Opponent's representative Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US Opponent's representative Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstraße 5 D-80538 München / DE | 26.04.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.11.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.12.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 27.04.2009 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/17] | Appeal following opposition | 04.02.2009 | Appeal received No. T0346/09 | 15.04.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.04.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2005 | BE | 15.06.2005 | CH | 15.06.2005 | ES | 15.06.2005 | FR | 15.06.2005 | IT | 15.06.2005 | LI | 15.06.2005 | NL | 15.06.2005 | IE | 21.07.2005 | LU | 21.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | DK | 15.09.2005 | GR | 15.09.2005 | SE | 15.09.2005 | PT | 23.11.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
ES | 15.06.2005 | ||
IT | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
LU | 21.07.2005 | ||
FR | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2008/06] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
ES | 15.06.2005 | ||
IT | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
LU | 21.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
FR | 11.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
ES | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
LU | 21.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
FR | 11.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/16] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
ES | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 15.08.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
FR | 11.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 15.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4247908 (LOCKHART JR ROBERT K, et al); | [X]US5029183 (TYMES LAROY [US]); | [A]US5046066 (MESSENGER STEVEN [CA]); | [A]US5276680 (MESSENGER STEVEN [CA]); | [A]US5289378 (MILLER PHILLIP [US], et al); | [A]US5295154 (MEIER ROBERT C [US], et al); | [AP]US5339316 (DIEPSTRATEN WILHELMUS J M [NL]) |