Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0776467
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.03.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
24.03.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] |
19.01.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
12.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.10.1999 |
First examination report |
|
28.09.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.08.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.08.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.04.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] |
18.04.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] |
04.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|