EP0776467 - FORCE OR EXTENSION SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOEMENS, Günter Eichenfeldstrasse 4 D-83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 02 /
GILCH, Markus Tulpenstrasse 14 D-85419 Mauern / DE | [1997/23] | Application number, filing date | 95927652.8 | 09.08.1995 | [1997/23] | WO1995DE01053 | Priority number, date | DE19944429050 | 16.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4429050 | [1997/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9605492 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0776467 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776467 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/14, G01B7/16 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
G01B7/22 (EP,US);
G01L1/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/23] | Title | German: | KRAFT- ODER DEHNUNGSSENSOR | [1997/23] | English: | FORCE OR EXTENSION SENSOR | [1997/23] | French: | CAPTEUR DE FORCE OU D'ALLONGEMENT | [1997/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 01.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2715831 (ELECTRIC POWER RES INST) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0354386 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1* the whole document * |