EP0721298 - NEW HERBICIDAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE POULENC AGRICULTURE LTD. Fyfield Road Ongar Essex CM5 OHW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states RHONE POULENC AGRICULTURE LTD. Fyfield Road Ongar, Essex CM5 OHW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAMBLIN, Alan Rhone-Poulenc Agriculture Limited Fyfield Road Ongar Essex CM5 0HW / GB | 02 /
HEWETT, Richard, Henry Rhone-Poulenc Agriculture Limited Fyfield Road Ongar Essex CM5 0HW / GB | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Stephen J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Bentham, Stephen J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1996/29] | Brachotte, Charles RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE Département Propriété Industrielle B.P. 9163 69263 Lyon Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95927676.7 | 20.07.1995 | [1996/29] | WO1995EP02864 | Priority number, date | US19940283756 | 01.08.1994 Original published format: US 283756 | US19950000019P | 08.06.1995 Original published format: US 19 P | [1998/23] |
Former [1996/29] | US19940283756 | 01.08.1994 | |
US19950000019 | 08.06.1995 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603877 | Date: | 15.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721298 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0721298 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/80, // (A01N43/80, 43:10, 37:26, 37:22) | [1996/29] | CPC: |
A01N43/80 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/80, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/80, A01N43/10, A01N37/26, A01N37/22 (EP);
A01N43/80, A01N43/78, A01N43/10, A01N37/26, A01N37/22, A01N43/78, A01N25/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/29] | Extension states | SI | 08.03.1996 | Title | German: | NEUE HERBIZIDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1996/29] | English: | NEW HERBICIDAL COMPOSITIONS | [1996/29] | French: | NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS HERBICIDES | [1996/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 02.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98100012.8 / EP0845210 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Request for further processing for: | 02.01.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.02.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0380447 (SANDOZ AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-33* page 2, line 1 - line 6 *; | [DXY]EP0418175 (RHONE POULENC AGRICULTURE [GB]) [DX] 1-4,7,9-13,15-29,31-33 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 31 * * page 5, line 13 * * page 5, line 27 * * page 34, line 51 - line 54 * * page 34, line 58 * * page 35, line 23 * [Y] 7; | [DXY]EP0527036 (RHONE POULENC AGRICULTURE [GB]) [DX] 1-4,9-33 * page 2, line 1 - line 18 * * page 4; example 1 * * page 10, line 27 - line 29 * [Y] 7 | [A] - J.F.DERR, "Wildflower tolerance to metolachlor and metolachlor combined with other broadleaf herbicides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940228), vol. 120, no. 9, Database accession no. 99283 [A] 1-33 * abstract * | [ ] - HORTSCIENCE, vol. 28, no. 10, pages 1023 - 1026 |