EP0775227 - WOOL PRE-TREATMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY P.O. Box 88 Sackville Street Manchester M60 1QD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY P.O. Box 88 Sackville Street Manchester M60 1QD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARR, Christopher, Michael 9 Meadow Rise Little Cross Winsford Cheshire / GB | 02 /
DODD, Kevin, James 29 Westfield Crescent Crawcrook Tyne & Wear NE40 4DS / GB | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Every, David Aidan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Every, David Aidan, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 95927857.3 | 07.08.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995GB01862 | Priority number, date | GB19940016032 | 09.08.1994 Original published format: GB 9416032 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9605355 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0775227 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775227 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D06M11/09, D06M15/643 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
D06M15/6436 (EP,US);
D06M11/09 (EP,US);
D06M2101/12 (EP,US);
D06M2200/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VORBEHANDELN VON WOLLE | [1997/22] | English: | WOOL PRE-TREATMENT METHOD | [1997/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRETRAITEMENT DE LA LAINE | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 09.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB578499 (WOLSEY LTD, et al) [X] 1,9,12* page 1, line 84 - page 2, line 84; claim - * | [X] - R.F. HUDSON ET AL.:, "The action of fluorine and fluorides on wool", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1947), vol. 41, column 1447 [X] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - SOC. DYERS. COLOURISTS, SYMPOSIUM ON FIBROUS PROTEINS, (1946), pages 193 - 198 |