EP0773718 - OXIDISING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARWICK INTERNATIONAL GROUP LIMITED Mostyn Holywell Clwyd CH8 9HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states WARWICK INTERNATIONAL GROUP LIMITED Mostyn Holywell, Clwyd CH8 9HE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROUD, Vincent, Brian 28 Woodland Drive Greenfield Holywell Clwyd CH8 7HZ / GB | 02 /
TOMPSETT, Stephen, James 5 Lower Bonc Terrace High Street Trelanwnyd Nr Rhyl Clwyd / GB | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95927860.7 | 04.08.1995 | [1997/21] | WO1995GB01865 | Priority number, date | GB19940015906 | 05.08.1994 Original published format: GB 9415906 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603873 | Date: | 15.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773718 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/16, // (A01N37/16, 59:24, 59:14, 59:12, 59:02, 59:00) | [1997/21] | CPC: |
A01N37/16 (EP,KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/16, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N37/16, A01N59/24, A01N59/14, A01N59/12, A01N59/02, A01N59/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/21] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OXYDIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1997/21] | English: | OXIDISING COMPOSITIONS | [1997/21] | French: | COMPOSITIONS OXYDANTES | [1997/21] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 04.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/28] | 28.02.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]EP0024368 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [XD] 1-8,11-17,20 * claim - *; | [Y]DE3615787 (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9,11-20 * page 3, line 1 - line 56 *; | [YD]WO9111105 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [YD] 1-9,11-20; | [Y]US4923677 (SIMON GILBERT I [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,11-20; | [Y]US4738840 (SIMON GILBERT I [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,11-20 |