EP0775126 - HYPOLIPIDEMIC 1,4-BENZOTHIAZEPINE-1,1-DIOXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road P.O. Box 129 London NW1 2BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road P.O. Box 129 London NW1 2BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRIEADDY, Lawrence, Edward 5924 Wintergreen Drive Raleigh, NC 27609 / US | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Hammett, Audrey Grace Campbell Glaxo Wellcome plc Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Hammett, Audrey Grace Campbell Glaxo Wellcome plc, Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95927877.1 | 09.08.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995GB01884 | Priority number, date | US19940288527 | 10.08.1994 Original published format: US 288527 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9605188 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775126 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775126 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D281/10, C07D417/04, C07D513/04, A61K31/55 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
C07D513/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/554 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/22] | Extension states | LT | 04.02.1997 | LV | 04.02.1997 | SI | 04.02.1997 | Title | German: | LIPIDSENKENDE 1,4-BENZOTHIAZEPIN-1,1-DIOXIDE | [1997/22] | English: | HYPOLIPIDEMIC 1,4-BENZOTHIAZEPINE-1,1-DIOXIDES | [1997/22] | French: | 1,4-BENZOTHIAZEPINE-1,1-DIOXYDES A ACTION HYPOLIPIDEMIQUE | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 05.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 14.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02003711.5 / EP1203769 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43] | Request for further processing for: | 19.02.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.03.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9316055 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [DX] 1-19 * see the whole document, particularly examples 30-34 and 37-39 *; | [PX]WO9418183 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB], et al) [PX] 1-19 * see the whole document, particularly examples 13 and 44 *; | [PX]WO9418184 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB], et al) [PX] 1-19* see the whole document, particularly example 19 * | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "Pharmaceutical compounds", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, EMSWORTH GB, vol. 354, pages 691 - 3 [X] 1-19 * the whole document * |