EP0807152 - DISCOLORATION PREVENTION IN PYRITHIONE-CONTAINING COATING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arch Chemicals, Inc. 501 Merritt 7, P.O. Box 5204 Norwalk, CT 06856-5204 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states Arch Chemicals, Inc. 501 Merritt 7, P.O. Box 5204 Norwalk, CT 06856-5204 / US | ||
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states OLIN CORPORATION 350 Knotter Drive P.O. Box 586 Cheshire, CT 06410-0586 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPPOCK, Paul, S. 129 A Clark Hill Road East Hampton, CT 06424 / US | 02 /
WALDRON, Craig 10 Cobblefield Court Wolcott, CT 06716 / US | [2001/45] |
Former [1998/04] | 01 /
KAPPOCK, Paul, S. 129 A Clark Hill Road East Hampton, CT 06424 / US | ||
02 /
WALDRON, Craig 10 Cobbefield Court Wolcott, CT 06716 / US | |||
Former [1997/47] | 01 /
KAPPOCK, Paul, S. 129 A Clark Hill Road East Hampton, CT 06424 / US | ||
02 /
WALDRON, Craig 101-19 Hitchcock Road Waterbury, CT 06705 / US | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95928242.7 | 03.08.1995 | [1997/47] | WO1995US09722 | Priority number, date | US19950383122 | 03.02.1995 Original published format: US 383122 | [1997/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623850 | Date: | 08.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807152 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807152 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09K15/28, C09K15/32, B32B15/04, C09D5/02, C09D7/12 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
C09D5/14 (EP,US);
C09D5/1687 (EP,US);
C09K15/02 (EP,US);
C09K15/28 (EP,KR,US);
C09K15/32 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/40, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/40, A01N25/22 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1997/47] | C09K15/28, C09K15/32, B32B15/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT [1997/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG DER ENTFÄRBUNG VON PYRITHION ENTHALTENDEN BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1997/47] | English: | DISCOLORATION PREVENTION IN PYRITHIONE-CONTAINING COATING COMPOSITIONS | [1997/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREVENTION DE LA DECOLORATION DE COMPOSITIONS POUR REVETEMENT CONTENANT DE LA PYRITHIONE | [1997/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.1997 | Search fee paid | 18.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 11.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5266105 (TSUNETA KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 * * column 5, line 41 - line 56 *; | [A]US5314719 (BATDORF VERNON [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,14 *; | [A]US4935061 (FRENCH CHERYL B [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US4161526 (GORMAN WILLIAM G [US]); | [A]US4818436 (FRENCH CHERYL B [US], et al); | [A]US4396766 (FARMER JR DOUGLAS A, et al); | [A]US4482715 (TROTZ SAMUEL I [US], et al); | [A]US4888368 (KOHL GRETCHEN S [US], et al); | [A]US4957658 (FRENCH CHERYL B [US], et al); | [Y]US5227156 (WIESE ROBERT S [US]); | [Y]US5137569 (WALDRON CRAIG [US], et al) |