Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8106032 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2012 | B2 | US2008293667 | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94392304 | 20.09.2004 | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US79347097 | 02.05.1997 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | US58831306 | 27.10.2006 | US41253999 | 04.10.1999 | US98081907 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7294620 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2007 | B2 | US2007105812 | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US79347097 | 02.05.1997 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | US58831106 | 27.10.2006 | US41253999 | 04.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7294619 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2007 | B2 | US2007105811 | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US88912704 | 13.07.2004 | US79347097 | 02.05.1997 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | US41253999 | 04.10.1999 | US58830806 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7294621 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2007 | B2 | US2007099870 | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94392304 | 20.09.2004 | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US79347097 | 02.05.1997 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | US58831306 | 27.10.2006 | US41253999 | 04.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7141557 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2006 | B2 | US2005080050 | 14.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94392304 | 20.09.2004 | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US79347097 | 02.05.1997 | US9510111 | 07.08.1995 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | US41253999 | 04.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7135584 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2006 | B2 | US2004259845 | 23.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88912704 | 13.07.2004 | US79347097 | 02.05.1997 | US9510111 | 07.08.1995 | US41253999 | 04.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4259611B | Global Dossier | 30.04.2009 | B2 | JPH10506619 | 30.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US9510111 | 07.08.1995 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1852121 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2007 | A3 | EP1852121 | 07.11.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | EP95928365 | 07.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3216695 | Global Dossier | 22.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US9510111 | 07.08.1995 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0781138 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2008 | B1 | EP0781138 | 02.07.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US9510111 | 07.08.1995 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2197319 | 27.01.2009 | C | CA2197319 | 07.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US9510111 | 07.08.1995 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69535758D1 | 03.07.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US9510111 | 07.08.1995 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5962437 | 05.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US79347097 | 02.05.1997 | US9510111 | 07.08.1995 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7129227 | 31.10.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US79347097 | 02.05.1997 | US9510111 | 07.08.1995 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | US41253999 | 04.10.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9606620 | Global Dossier | 13.06.1996 | A3 | WO9606620 | 07.03.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011051996 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007056033 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE395922T | 15.06.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US31490194 | 29.09.1994 | US29741694 | 29.08.1994 | Type | Divisional application | EP1852121 |