EP0781138 - LIPID ANALOGS FOR TREATING VIRAL INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY Medical Center Boulevard Winston-Salem, NC 27157-1023 / US | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 300 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4100 Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27599-4100 / US | [2008/21] |
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY Medical Center Boulevard Winston-Salem, NC 27157-1023 / US | ||
For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 300 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4100 Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27599-4100 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUCERA, Louis S. 4860 Ellen Avenue Pfafftown, NC 27040 / US | 02 /
MORRIS-NATSCHKE, Susan L. 1225 Martha's Chapel Road Apex, NC 27502 / US | 03 /
ISHAQ, Khalid S. 105 Hunter Hill Place Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | [2006/37] |
Former [1997/27] | 01 /
KUCERA, Louis S. 4860 Ellen Avenue Pfafftown, NC 27040 / US | ||
02 /
MORRIS-NATSCHKE, Susan L. 1225 Martha's chapel road Apex, NC 27502 / US | |||
03 /
ISHAQ, Khalid S. 105 Hunter Hill Place Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Maiwald, Walter Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/32] | Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Maiwald GmbH, Postfach 33 05 23 80065 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/27] | Weber, Manfred, Dr. c/o Boehringer Mannheim GmbH, Patentabteilung, Sandhoferstrasse 116 68298 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 95928365.6 | 07.08.1995 | [1997/27] | WO1995US10111 | Priority number, date | US19940297416 | 29.08.1994 Original published format: US 297416 | US19940314901 | 29.09.1994 Original published format: US 314901 | [1997/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9606620 | Date: | 07.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0781138 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0781138 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/685, A61K31/675, C07F3/10, C07H19/10, C07H19/20, A61K31/66, A61K31/70, // A61P31/18 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
A61K31/685 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K31/7072 (EP,US);
A61K31/7076 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07F9/091 (EP,US);
C07F9/10 (EP,US);
C07F9/106 (EP,US);
C07F9/117 (EP,US);
C07F9/65586 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/33] | A61K31/685, A61K31/675, C07F3/10, C07H19/10, C07H19/20, A61K31/66, A61K31/70 | ||
Former IPC [1997/27] | A61K31/685, A61K31/675, C07F3/10, C07H19/10, C07H19/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/27] | Title | German: | LIPID-ANALOGE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VIRALEN INFEKTIONEN | [1997/27] | English: | LIPID ANALOGS FOR TREATING VIRAL INFECTIONS | [1997/27] | French: | ANALOGUES DE LIPIDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS VIRALES | [1997/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 23.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.06.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07016369.6 / EP1852121 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2008 | BE | 21.05.2008 | DK | 21.05.2008 | IT | 21.05.2008 | NL | 21.05.2008 | IE | 07.08.2008 | LU | 07.08.2008 | GB | 21.08.2008 | SE | 21.08.2008 | GR | 22.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | ES | 01.09.2008 | FR | 01.09.2008 | PT | 21.10.2008 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
LU | 07.08.2008 | ||
GB | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
GR | 22.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
LU | 07.08.2008 | ||
GB | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GB | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 01.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3934820 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [XY] 1-52,85-91,103 * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 5 * * page 5, paragraph L *; | [A]WO9109602 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20,35-40,45-72,85-91,103* the whole document *; | [Y]DE4010228 (MUELLER WERNER E G PROF DR [DE], et al) [Y] 1-20,35-40,85-91 * claim 1 * | [Y] - "In vitro evaluation of phosphocholine and quaternary ammonium containing lipids as novel anti-HIV agents", J.MED.CHEM., vol. 34, no. 4, pages 1377 - 83 [Y] 103 * page 1377, column L, line 26 - line 38 * | [YP] - "Membrane interactive phospholipids inhibit HIV type 1-induced cell fusion and surface gp160/gp 120 binding to monoclonal antibody", AIDS RES. HUM. RETROVIRUSES, vol. 11, no. 6, pages 705 - 712 [YP] 1-52 * page 705 * |