EP0826255 - MONOLITHIC LASER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uniphase Lasers Limited Crabtree Farm Newnham Northants NN11 6et / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states Uniphase Lasers Limited Crabtree Farm Newnham, Northants NN11 6et / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACKINNON, Neil 57 Ardneil Court Ardrossan, Ayrshire / GB | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, Dr., et al Withers & Rogers, 4, Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95928545.3 | 11.08.1995 | [1998/10] | WO1995GB01897 | Priority number, date | GB19950009739 | 13.05.1995 Original published format: GB 9509739 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9636095 | Date: | 14.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0826255 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0826255 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/06, H01S3/109, H01S3/098 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
H01S3/0627 (EP,US);
H01S3/109 (EP,US);
H01S3/0401 (EP,US);
H01S3/0405 (EP,US);
H01S3/042 (EP,US);
H01S3/0604 (EP,US);
H01S3/106 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1998/46] |
Former [1998/10] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | MONOLITHISCHE LASER | [1998/10] | English: | MONOLITHIC LASER | [1998/10] | French: | LASER MONOLITHE | [1998/10] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 30.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 06.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Request for further processing for: | 16.02.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0455383 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [X] 1,16-20 * abstract *; | [X]DE4200204 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,8 * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 7 *; | [X]US5295146 (GAVRILOVIC PAVLE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * column 6, line 8 - line 26; claim 12 *; | [X]US5341393 (OKAZAKI YOJI [JP], et al) [X] 17,24* column 9, line 5 - line 18 *; | [X]US5377212 (TATSUNO KIMIO [JP], et al) [X] 17-20,23 * abstract * * column 6, line 22 - line 28; figures 2,5 *; | [X]JPH0799360 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,4; | US5436920 [ ] (MINEMOTO HISASHI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 8, line 3 - line 23 * * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 2 * | [X] - N.MACKINNON ET AL., "A laser diode array pumped, Nd:YVO4/KTP, composite material microchip laser", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, AMSTERDAM NL, (19940201), vol. 105, no. 3,4, pages 183 - 187 [X] 1,8 * the whole document * |