EP0782807 - SMART CARCD, SIGNAL PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SIGNAL PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/28] | SMART-CARD BASED ACCESS CONTROL SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED SECURITY | ||
[2000/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10333 North Meridian Street Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/28] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10330 North Meridian St Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANEY, John, William 18019 Sunridge Circle Noblesville, IN 46060 / US | [1997/28] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1997/28] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte THOMSON multimedia, 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95928755.8 | 04.08.1995 | [1997/28] | WO1995US09953 | Priority number, date | US19940292830 | 19.08.1994 Original published format: US 292830 | [1997/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9606504 | Date: | 29.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0782807 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0782807 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/167, G07F7/10 | [1997/28] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (KR);
G06Q20/229 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/346 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40975 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/42623 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1997/28] | Title | German: | CHIPKARTE, SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR SIGNALVERARBEITUNG | [2000/42] | English: | SMART CARCD, SIGNAL PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SIGNAL PROCESSING | [2000/42] | French: | CARTE INTELLIGENTE, APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX | [2000/42] |
Former [1997/28] | AUF CHIPKARTEN BASIERENDES ZUGANGSKONTROLLSYSTEM MIT VERBESSERTER SICHERHEIT | ||
Former [1997/28] | SMART-CARD BASED ACCESS CONTROL SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED SECURITY | ||
Former [1997/28] | SYSTEME D'AUTORISATION D'ACCES UTILISANT DES CARTES INTELLIGENTES, A SECURITE AMELIOREE | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/28] | 26.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Request for further processing for: | 08.03.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 08.03.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 04.08.2002 | IE | 05.08.2002 | [2008/29] |
Former [2003/42] | IE | 05.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4993066 (JENKINS HENRY H [US]) [Y] 1,5,7,8,14,15 * column W *; | [Y]EP0428252 (NEWS DATA SECURITY PRODUCTS LT [HK]) [Y] 1,5,7,8,14,15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0585833 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0588184 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]) |