EP0755321 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EOS GmbH Electro Optical Systems Robert-Stirling-Ring 1 82152 Krailling / DE | [2003/33] |
Former [1997/05] | For all designated states EOS GmbH ELECTRO OPTICAL SYSTEMS Pasinger Strasse 2 82152 Planegg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLER, Peter Keplerweg 7 D-82152 Martinsried / DE | 02 /
WILKENING, Christian Oberer Anger 14 D-86911 Diessen / DE | 03 /
LANGER, Hans, J. Am Wasserbogen 46 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95929059.4 | 02.08.1995 | [1997/05] | WO1995EP03078 | Priority number, date | DE19944433118 | 16.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4433118 | [1997/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9608360 | Date: | 21.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755321 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755321 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0755321 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00, G03C9/08 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
G03F7/0037 (EP);
B29C67/00 (KR);
B29C64/153 (EP);
G03C9/08 (KR);
B29K2009/06 (EP);
B29K2025/00 (EP);
B29K2055/02 (EP);
B29K2071/12 (EP);
B29K2077/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTES | [1997/05] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT | [1997/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [1997/05] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 04.11.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1998
03.08.1998
ADMISSIBLE 3D Systems, Inc. 26081 Avenue Hall Valencia, CA 91355 / US Opponent's representative Haug, Dietmar Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1998
03.08.1998
ADMISSIBLE 3D Systems, Inc. 26081 Avenue Hall Valencia, CA 91355 / US Opponent's representative Haug, Dietmar Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1998
03.08.1998
ADMISSIBLE 3D Systems, Inc. 26081 Avenue Hall Valencia, CA 91355 / US Opponent's representative Haug, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing. Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1998
DTM Corporation 1611 Headway Circle, Building 2 Austin, Texas 78754 / US Opponent's representative Haug, Dietmar Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 28.09.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.01.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.12.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.01.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.01.2000 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 21.01.2003 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.03.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.06.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 21.03.2000 | Appeal received No. T0298/00 | 17.05.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.01.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 21.01.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.02.2003 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0393672 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,10 * column W * [Y] 3,4,6; | [Y]DE4007248 (DU PONT DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [Y] 3,4,6 * page 3, line 51 - page 4, line 23; examples 2,6 *; | [XY]JPH0224127 ; | [Y]US5304329 (DICKENS JR ELMER D [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,10 * column 8, line 23 - line 36; figure -; claims 1,9 *; | [Y]JPS60224568 ; | [A]WO9006540 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 11 - page 12 * | [XA] - VISMAN R, "FAST PROTOTYPING MET 'SELECTIVE LASER SINTERING'", KUNSTSTOF EN RUBBER, ROTTERDAM NL, (19921201), vol. 44, no. 12, pages 14 - 18, XP000327819 [X] 1,2,6,10 * the whole document * [A] 8 | [XY] - "MAKE IT IN A MINUTE : MACHINES THAT USE LASERS TO FORM MATERIALS MAY BE THE KEY TO QUICK, INEXPENSIVE PROTOTYPING", MACHINE DESIGN, (19900208), vol. 62, no. 3, pages 127 - 132, XP000102461 [X] 1,2,10 * page 132, column L * [Y] 4,8 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 10, Database accession no. 90-071252, & JPH0224127 A 19900126 (MITSUI ENG. & SHIPBUILDING) [X] 1,10 * abstract * [Y] 4,8 | [X] - SCHAETTI T, "RAPID PROTOTYPING ETABLIERT SICH . VERFAHREN ZUR SCHNELLEN FERTIGUNG VON MODELLEN UND MUSTERTEILEN", TECHNISCHE RUNDSCHAU, (19910517), vol. 83, no. 20, pages 36 - 41, 43, XP000230938 [X] 1,2,10 * page 40, column R, paragraph L - page 41, column L * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860402), vol. 10, no. 83, Database accession no. (M - 466), & JP60224568 A 19851108 (JIYANOME SEWING MACHINE KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-3,10 * abstract * | Opposition | - Solid Freeform Fabrication Symposium Proceedings, August 6-8, 1990, Austin, Texas, USA, "Sintering Rates in the Selective Laser Sintering Process", Christian Nelson and J.W. Barlow, Department of Chemical Engineering, University of Texas at Austin, pp. 164-170 | - Kunststoff Handbuch 3/2, Technische Polymer-Blends, Gerhard W. Becker und Dietrich Braun, Carl Hanser Verlag, München Wien, 1993, Seiten 2,3,12 und 13 |