EP0797796 - METHOD FOR THE INDICATION OF UPDATING PROCESS FOR A REMOTE DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGLETON, Vincent, Joseph Culworth Station Daventry, Northants MN11 6SQ / GB | 02 /
ADAMS, Paul, Stuart Chestnuts, Dean Down Drove, Littleton Winchester, Hants SO22 6PP / GB | 03 /
GLADWYN, Benedict, Daniel Chestnuts, Dean Down Drove, Littleton Winchester, Hants SO22 6PP / GB | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Davies, Simon Robert I B M UK Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Davies, Simon Robert I B M UK Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95929179.0 | 23.08.1995 | [1997/40] | WO1995GB01998 | Priority number, date | GB19940025142 | 13.12.1994 Original published format: GB 9425142 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618943 | Date: | 20.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0797796 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0797796 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/1462 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANZEIGEN DER AKTUALISIERUNGSVERARBEITUNG FÜR EINE FERNVERARBEITETE ANZEIGE | [1997/40] | English: | METHOD FOR THE INDICATION OF UPDATING PROCESS FOR A REMOTE DISPLAY | [1997/40] | French: | PROCEDE D'INDICATION D'UN PROCESSUS DE MISE A JOUR EN VUE D'UN AFFICHAGE A DISTANCE | [1997/40] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.07.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 23.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0475581 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO.); | [AD]EP0590817 (INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CO.); | [AD]WO8912859 (FUJITSU LTD.); | [A]WO9109378 (OPTIONS UNLIMITED RESEARCH CO.) |