EP0771294 - FLEXIBLE BARRIER MEMBER USEFUL IN AEROSOL DISPENSERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abplanalp, Robert Henry 10 Hewitt Avenue Bronxville New York 10708 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states Abplanalp, Robert Henry 10 Hewitt Avenue Bronxville New York 10708 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95929351.5 | 19.07.1995 | [1997/19] | WO1995US09734 | Priority number, date | US19940277258 | 19.07.1994 Original published format: US 277258 | US19940292062 | 17.08.1994 Original published format: US 292062 | US19950442638 | 17.05.1995 Original published format: US 442638 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9602439 | Date: | 01.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0771294 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/14 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
B29C51/04 (EP);
B65D83/62 (EP);
B29C2035/1616 (EP);
B29C2791/006 (EP);
B29C2793/009 (EP);
B29C33/56 (EP);
B29C51/08 (EP);
B29C51/14 (EP);
B29C51/445 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/19] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLES SPERRELEMENT GEEIGNET FÜR AEROSOL-AUSGABEVORRICHTUNGEN | [1997/19] | English: | FLEXIBLE BARRIER MEMBER USEFUL IN AEROSOL DISPENSERS | [1997/19] | French: | ELEMENT DE BARRIERE FLEXIBLE UTILE POUR LES BOMBES AEROSOL | [1997/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 17.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 02.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/50] | 10.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3620420 (NORMOS NORBERT) [X] 1-3,5-9,13,15-18 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 24; figure - * | International search | [A]US3415425 (KNIGHT FRANCIS J, et al); | [A]US3070265 (EVERETT JOHN W); | [A]US3145884 (EVERETT JOHN W) |