EP0776429 - WET DISC BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brake Technologies Pty. Ltd. 21 Britannia Street Geelong West, VIC 3218 / AU | [1999/35] |
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states PARSONS, Francis Edward 21 Britannia Street Geelong West, VIC 3218 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parsons, Francis Edward 21 Britannia Street Geelong West, VIC 3218 / AU | [2002/22] |
Former [1997/23] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Newby, Martin John, et al Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Newby, Martin John, et al J.Y. & G.W. Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | ||
Former [1997/23] | Newby, Martin John J.Y. & G.W. Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95929648.4 | 24.08.1995 | [1997/23] | WO1995AU00529 | Priority number, date | AU1994PM07720 | 26.08.1994 Original published format: AU PM772094 | [1997/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9607034 | Date: | 07.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0776429 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776429 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.03.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/853, F16D65/092, F16D65/12, F16D55/228, F16D69/00 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
F16D69/00 (EP,KR,US);
F16D65/092 (EP,US);
F16D65/128 (EP,US);
F16D65/853 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2069/004 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/23] | Title | German: | NASSLAUFENDE SCHEIBENBREMSE | [1997/23] | English: | WET DISC BRAKE | [1997/23] | French: | FREIN A DISQUE HUMIDE | [1997/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.1997 | Search fee paid | 26.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 26.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 17.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 24.08.2002 | MC | 01.03.2003 | [2006/44] |
Former [2004/39] | LU | 24.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR956620 (BUDD WHEEL COMPANY) [A] 21-23 * the whole document *; | [A]US2924308 (KELLEY OLIVER K) [A] 23,24 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 62; figure - *; | [A]FR1319637 (GIRLING LTD) [A] 1,16 * figure - *; | [A]US4011930 (COONS ROBERT R, et al) [A] 21,22 * column W *; | [A]US4287978 (STAUB JR VINCENT M) [A] 1 * column W *; | [Y]EP0259809 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [Y] 25 * page 2, line 4 - line 6 * * page 4, line 41 - line 45; example 1 *; | [A]US4828089 (COLLINS MARCUS H [US], et al) [A] 25* the whole document *; | [A]DE9003854U (BECORIT-GESELLSCHAFT W. BECKMANN) [A] 1,3-6,16 * the whole document *; | [XA]FR2640337 (ABEX EQUIPEMENTS SA [FR]) [X] 9,11,13 * page 3, line 18 - line 20; figure 5 * * page 4, line 4 - line 12; figure 2 * [A] 1,16; | [A]US5064546 (DASAI MASASHI [JP]) [A] 25 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 14 - line 27 * * example -; table . *; | [A]DE4231549 (FLERTEX SA [FR]) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO9307402 (PARSONS FRANCIS EDWARD [AU]) [DY] 25 * page 6, line 9 - line 28; figures 1-3 *; | [E]FR2733290 (FLERTEX SA [FR]) [E] 16 * abstract * | International search | [X]AU1431755 ; | [X]AU1798856 ; | [X]GB1059706 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [X]US3405786 (GOODE ROBERT W); | [A]DE2539557 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [X]EP0128758 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]); | [X]EP0307079 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0486772 (RUETGERS PAGID AG [DE]); | [A]WO9307402 (PARSONS FRANCIS EDWARD [AU]) |