EP0775001 - COMPUTERIZED GAME BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.1999 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUPER DIMENSION INC. Corporation Trust Center, 1209 Orange street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [1997/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILBOA, Pinhas 8 Zidkiyahu Street 34409 Haifa / IL | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95930131.8 | 25.07.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995US10096 | Priority number, date | IL19940110502 | 28.07.1994 Original published format: IL 11050294 | IL19950113452 | 20.04.1995 Original published format: IL 11345295 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603188 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775001 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/00 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
A63F3/00643 (EP,US);
A63F13/214 (US);
A63F13/2145 (EP);
A63F13/235 (EP,US);
A63F13/26 (EP);
A63F2003/00662 (EP,US);
A63F2009/2447 (EP,US);
A63F2009/2457 (EP,US);
A63F2009/247 (EP,US);
A63F2009/2486 (EP,US);
A63F2009/2494 (EP,US);
A63F2300/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/22] | Title | German: | COMPUTERERISIERTES SPIELBRETT | [1997/22] | English: | COMPUTERIZED GAME BOARD | [1997/22] | French: | TABLE DE JEU AVEC ORDINATEUR | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 24.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 08.12.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2271724 (BAXTER MALCOLM [GB]) [X] 1-5* claim - * | International search | [A]US4341385 (DOYLE HOLLY T, et al); | [A]US5013047 (SCHWAB GUENTHER [DE]); | [A]US5082286 (RYAN PAUL [GB], et al); | [A]US5088928 (CHAN JAMES K [US]); | [A]US5129654 (BOGNER BRUCE F [US]); | [A]US5188368 (RYAN PAUL T [GB]) |