EP0776479 - SYSTEM FOR MONITORING AN UNGROUNDED POWER DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/23] | SYSTEM FOR MONITORING A DUAL VOLTAGE UNGROUNDED SYSTEM | ||
[2001/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 South Roselle Road Palatine, IL 60067 / US | [1997/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENESH, Stephen, Patrick 449 Oak Crest Drive Oshkosh, WI 54904 / US | 02 /
HASENOHRL, David, William 396 Oak Manor Drive Oshkosh, WI 54904 / US | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Gray, John James, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Gray, John James, et al Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS / GB | ||
Former [1997/23] | Sorrell, Terence Gordon Fitzpatricks, Cardinal Court, 23, Thomas More Street London E1 9YY / GB | Application number, filing date | 95930193.8 | 17.08.1995 | [1997/23] | WO1995US10476 | Priority number, date | US19940292121 | 17.08.1994 Original published format: US 292121 | [1997/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9605516 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0776479 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776479 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01R27/18 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
G01R27/18 (EP,US);
G01R31/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1997/23] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES NICHT-GEERDETEN ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSSYSTEMS | [2001/28] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MONITORING AN UNGROUNDED POWER DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM | [2001/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE D'UN SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION D'ENERGIE NON RELIE A LA TERRE | [2001/28] |
Former [1997/23] | SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES ZWEIFACHEN NICHT-GEERDETEN SYSTEMS | ||
Former [1997/23] | SYSTEM FOR MONITORING A DUAL VOLTAGE UNGROUNDED SYSTEM | ||
Former [1997/23] | DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE D'UN SYSTEME A DOUBLE TENSION NON RELIE A LA TERRE | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 03.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.06.2002 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 07.08.2002 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US3976987 (ANGER ERNEST G) [AD] 1 * see the abstract *; | [A]EP0398824 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4206398 (JANNING EUGENE A [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |