Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10513340 | Global Dossier | 22.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US29241694 | 18.08.1994 | US47622995 | 07.06.1995 | US9510536 | 17.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3367495 | Global Dossier | 14.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US29241694 | 18.08.1994 | US47622995 | 07.06.1995 | US9510536 | 17.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0777861 | Global Dossier | 14.04.1999 | B1 | EP0777861 | 11.06.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29241694 | 18.08.1994 | US47622995 | 07.06.1995 | US9510536 | 17.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69509104T | 18.11.1999 | T2 | DE69509104D1 | 20.05.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US29241694 | 18.08.1994 | US47622995 | 07.06.1995 | US9510536 | 17.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5472846 | 05.12.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US29241694 | 18.08.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9606356 | Global Dossier | 29.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29241694 | 18.08.1994 | US47622995 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2197769 | 29.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29241694 | 18.08.1994 | US47622995 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5792617 | 11.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US29241694 | 18.08.1994 | US47622995 | 07.06.1995 |