EP0777861 - TEST KIT AND METHOD FOR DETECTION OF TARGET CELLS AND MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rotman, M. Boris 1062 East Shore Road Jamestown, RI 02835 / US | [1997/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95930207.6 | 17.08.1995 | [1997/24] | WO1995US10536 | Priority number, date | US19940292416 | 18.08.1994 Original published format: US 292416 | US19950476229 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 476229 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9606356 | Date: | 29.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777861 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777861 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/58, G01N33/574, G01N33/569, G01N33/53, C12Q1/02, G01N33/531, G01N33/535 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
C12Q1/18 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (EP,US);
G01N33/56966 (EP,US);
G01N33/56972 (EP,US);
G01N33/57484 (EP,US);
G01N33/57492 (EP,US);
G01N33/58 (EP,US);
G01N33/581 (EP,US);
Y10S435/834 (EP);
Y10S435/839 (EP);
Y10S435/848 (EP);
Y10S435/878 (EP);
Y10S435/881 (EP);
Y10S435/883 (EP);
Y10S435/966 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1997/24] | Title | German: | TESTSATZ UND VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEISS ZIELZELLEN UND MOLEKÜLE | [1997/24] | English: | TEST KIT AND METHOD FOR DETECTION OF TARGET CELLS AND MOLECULES | [1997/24] | French: | COFFRET POUR TESTS ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE MOLECULES ET DE CELLULES CIBLES | [1997/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 09.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.04.1999 | CH | 14.04.1999 | ES | 14.04.1999 | IT | 14.04.1999 | LI | 14.04.1999 | SE | 14.04.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/26] | BE | 14.04.1999 | |
CH | 14.04.1999 | ||
ES | 14.04.1999 | ||
LI | 14.04.1999 | ||
SE | 14.04.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 14.04.1999 | |
CH | 14.04.1999 | ||
LI | 14.04.1999 | ||
SE | 14.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 14.04.1999 | |
CH | 14.04.1999 | ||
LI | 14.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 14.04.1999 | |
CH | 20.07.1999 | ||
LI | 20.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 14.04.1999 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4002532 (WELTMAN JOEL K, et al) [AD] 1-15* the whole document * | [A] - H. SCHMETZER ET AL., "IMMUNOLOGICAL PHENOTYPING IN SITU OF MYELOID COLONIES IN AGAR CULTURES", EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY, WASHINGTON DC USA, vol. 15, no. 8, pages 877 - 882 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [AD] - P. THOMAS ET AL., "KERATINS VERSUS EPITHELIAL MEMBRANE ANTIGEN IN TUMOR DIAGNOSIS: COMPARISON OF FIVE MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES", HUMAN PATHOLOGY, WASHINGTON DC USA, vol. 18, pages 728 - 734 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - PREMI, T.; BATTIFORA, H., HUMAN PATHOL., (1987), vol. 18, pages 728 - 734 | - SCHMELTZER, H. ET AL., EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY, (1987), vol. 15, pages 877 - 882 |